Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0970410 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0970410



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 63
28.07.2011 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
11.09.2002 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
27.09.2001 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
27.06.2001 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
27.06.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
27.06.2001 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
08.06.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
10.05.2001 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
08.05.2001 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
28.04.2001 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
25.04.2001 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
25.04.2001 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.04.2001 Text intended for grant Search / examination 7
18.04.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
05.04.2001 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
01.12.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
05.08.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
21.01.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
02.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 10
23.09.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
23.09.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 9