Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0970410
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0970410Global Dossier 07.11.2001B1
EP0970410 12.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP9801612 19.03.1998
DE19711760 21.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2283973 10.07.2001C
CA2283973 01.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
EP9801612 19.03.1998
DE19711760 21.03.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59802062D 13.12.2001D1
Priority number Date
EP9801612 19.03.1998
DE19711760 21.03.1997
DE59802062 19.03.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6250559 26.06.2001B1
Priority number Date
EP9801612 19.03.1998
DE19711760 21.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9843142Global Dossier 01.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
DE19711760 21.03.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19711760 01.10.1998C1
Priority number Date
DE19711760 21.03.1997