Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970410

EP0970410 - THERMOSTATIC WATER MIXER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.09.2002
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONEYWELL AG
Kaiserleistrasse 39
63067 Offenbach am Main / DE
[2001/45]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
HONEYWELL AG
Kaiserleistrasse 39
63067 Offenbach / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KNAUSS, Erwin
Kilianstrasse 16
D-74831 Gundelsheim / DE
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Fritz, Edmund Lothar , et al
Fritz & Brandenburg
Patentanwälte
Stolbergerstrasse 368
50933 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/30]Fritz, Edmund Lothar, Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Fritz Ostentor 9
59757 Arnsberg-Herdringen / DE
Former [2001/22]Sturm, Christoph , et al
Honeywell Holding AG, IP Europe Law Dept., Kaiserleistrasse 39
63067 Offenbach am Main / DE
Former [2000/02]Herzbach, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing.
Honeywell Holding AG, Patent- und Lizenzabteilung, Kaiserleistrasse 39
63067 Offenbach am Main / DE
Application number, filing date98912490.419.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998EP01612
Priority number, dateDE199711176021.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19711760
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843142
Date:01.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970410
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970410
Date:07.11.2001
Language:DE
[2001/45]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:G05D23/13
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/02]
TitleGerman:THERMOSTATISCHER WASSERMISCHER[2000/02]
English:THERMOSTATIC WATER MIXER[2000/02]
French:MELANGEUR HYDRAULIQUE THERMOSTATIQUE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase05.08.1999National basic fee paid 
05.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
25.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.05.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.06.2001Fee for grant paid
27.06.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.08.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT07.11.2001
NL07.11.2001
[2008/15]
Former [2003/09]NL07.11.2001
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO9616362  (GEVIPI AG [LI], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2,6-8;
 [XA]US3955759  (KNAPP ALFONS) [X] 1 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 17; figure 1 * [A] 6-8;
 [AD]DE4423240  (HANSA METALLWERKE AG [DE]) [AD] 1,6-8 * column 3, line 21 - column 4, line 14; figure . *;
 [A]FR2295327  (PONT A MOUSSON [FR]) [A] 1,6-8 * page 4, line 35 - page 5, line 17; figure 1 *
by applicantDE4423240