Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980567

EP0980567 - IMPLEMENTATION OF COUPLING BETWEEN HOST UNIT AND SMART CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2013
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.03.2013  [2013/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rapeli, Juha
Schillerstrasse 14
41061 Mönchengladbach / DE
[2009/25]
Former [2004/16]For all designated states
Rapeli, Juha
Edelweissweg 2
41352 Korschenbroich / DE
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
Rapeli, Juha
47, route de la Californie
72560 Change Cedex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/08]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2004/14]
Former [2000/08]Savela, Antti-Jussi , et al
Patent Agency Compatent Ltd. Pitkänsillanranta 3 B
00530 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date98912534.901.04.1998
[2000/08]
WO1998FI00292
Priority number, dateFI1997000135902.04.1997         Original published format: FI 971359
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844450
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980567
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/077, G06K19/07, G06K7/10
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/08]
TitleGerman:IMPLEMENTIERUNG ZUM VERBINDEN EINES HAUPTGERÄTES MIT EINER CHIPKARTE[2000/08]
English:IMPLEMENTATION OF COUPLING BETWEEN HOST UNIT AND SMART CARD[2000/08]
French:REALISATION DE COUPLAGE ENTRE UNE UNITE HOTE ET UNE CARTE A MICROPROCESSEUR[2000/08]
Entry into regional phase19.10.1999National basic fee paid 
19.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
19.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/08]
04.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/12]
17.11.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/12]
30.12.2003Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
23.07.2012Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request rejected
Public notificationsDecision dated 03.08.12, EPO Form F2901AK
Rapeli, Juha
Schillerstrasse 14
41061 Mönchengladbach / DE
[2012/42]
Communication pursuant to Article 113 EPC (EPO Form 2901 dated 12.01.2012)
Rapeli, Juha
Schillerstrasse 14
41061 Mönchengladbach / DE
[2012/09]
Divisional application(s)EP03007785.3  / EP1345165
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.10.2002
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
03.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200306   M06   Not yet paid
30.04.200407   M06   Not yet paid
30.04.200508   M06   Not yet paid
30.04.200609   M06   Not yet paid
30.04.200710   M06   Not yet paid
30.04.200811   M06   Not yet paid
30.04.200912   M06   Not yet paid
30.04.201013   M06   Not yet paid
30.04.201114   M06   Not yet paid
30.04.201215   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US4742573  (POPOVIC RADIVOJE [CH]);
 [X]US3971916  (MORENO ROLAND);
 [X]US4783598  (MCADAMS JR CHARLES K [US]);
 [X]DE3047322  (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]);
 [A]GB2278085  (MOTOROLA INC [US]);
 [A]US5196682  (ENGLEHARDT GARY A [US]);
 [A]DE19500805  (ADP GAUSELMANN GMBH [DE])