Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971975

EP0971975 - A METHOD OF PRODUCING AN EXPANDED MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.07.2001
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.09.2001 [2001/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Evans, Albert Edward John
157 Moorland View Road Walton, Chesterfield
Derbyshire S40 3DD / GB
For all designated states
Harris, Andrew John
Highwood House, Crawley Ridge Camberley
Surrey GU15 2AN / GB
For all designated states
MODEQUEST PROJECTS LIMITED
207 Clevedon Road Tickenham, Clevedon
North Somerset BS21 6RX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Evans, Albert Edward John
157 Moorland View Road
Walton, Chesterfield, Derbyshire S40 3DD / GB
For all designated states
Harris, Andrew John
Highwood House, Crawley Ridge
Camberley, Surrey GU15 2AN / GB
For all designated states
Modequest Projects Limited
207 Clevedon Road
Tickenham, Clevedon, North Somerset BS21 6RX / GB
Inventor(s)01 / EVANS, Albert, Edward, John
157 Moorland View Road
Walton, Chesterfield, Derbyshire S40 3DD / GB
02 / HARRIS, Andrew, John
Highwood House, Crawley Ridge
Camberley, Surrey GU15 2AN / GB
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Bryer, Kenneth Robert , et al
Bryers LLP
7 Gay Street
Bath
BA1 2PH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Bryer, Kenneth Robert , et al
K.R. Bryer & Co. 7 Gay Street
Bath BA1 2PH / GB
Application number, filing date98912627.124.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998GB00891
Priority number, dateGB1997000621924.03.1997         Original published format: GB 9706219
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9842775
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971975
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search reportEP07.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08J9/14, B29C44/34
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GESCHÄUMTEM MATERIAL[2000/03]
English:A METHOD OF PRODUCING AN EXPANDED MATERIAL[2000/03]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN MATERIAU EXPANSE OU MOUSSE ET DE CONSTITUANTS, ET APPAREIL POUR METTRE EN OEUVRE CE PROCEDE[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase15.10.1999National basic fee paid 
15.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
15.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
10.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/36]
28.03.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200003   M06   Fee paid on   21.07.2000
31.03.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]US4478958  (CARLSON JOHN D [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * example 5 * * claim - * [Y] 4-6,8-13,17-33,36-42;
 [XY]US4033909  (PAPA ANTHONY JOSEPH) [X] 3 * examples 1,4 * * claim - * [Y] 4-6,8-13,17-33,36-42;
 [XA]US5340888  (LEMON PETER H R B [GB], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, lines 37-51 * * column 6, lines 47-59 * * columns 23-24; example 10 * * claim - * [A] 3-42;
 [A]GB2232673  (EVANS ALBERT EDWARD JOHN) [A] 1-42 * claim - *