blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0978207 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0978207



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 155
22.05.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
07.04.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
04.12.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
04.08.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
15.07.2003 Request for change of address Search / examination 3
25.04.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.03.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.03.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
10.03.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
05.03.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 11
24.02.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.02.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
11.02.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) Search / examination 1
07.02.2003 Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant Search / examination 1
04.02.2003 Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant Search / examination 1
31.10.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
31.10.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
31.10.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
15.07.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
03.07.2002 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
12.04.2002 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.03.2002 General enquiry Search / examination 1
20.06.2001 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.05.2001 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
16.08.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
05.08.2000 Request for change of name Search / examination 7
29.12.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
18.11.1999 Claims Search / examination 1
18.11.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
18.11.1999 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 1
18.11.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
15.11.1999 Claims Search / examination 1
15.11.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
15.11.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
05.08.1999 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 9
01.06.1999 Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant Search / examination 1
01.06.1999 Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant Search / examination 1
20.05.1999 Request for change of name Search / examination 3
20.05.1999 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 3
17.02.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
05.02.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
17.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 22
20.10.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 17