blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0978207


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
09.04.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.05.2004  [2004/22]
02.08.2003 Change - applicant published on  17.09.2003  [2003/38]
18.04.2003 (Expected) grant published on  04.06.2003  [2003/23]
16.04.2003 Renewal fee
14.03.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.02.2003 Change - representative published on  09.04.2003  [2003/15]
23.10.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.07.2002 Change - representative published on  28.08.2002  [2002/35]
02.07.2002 Renewal fee
21.05.2002 Renewal fee
15.06.2001 Change - representative published on  01.08.2001 [2001/31]
28.03.2001 Renewal fee
11.08.2000 Change - applicant published on  27.09.2000 [2000/39]
29.03.2000 Renewal fee
23.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.02.2000 [2000/06]
23.12.1999 Request for examination filed published on  09.02.2000 [2000/06]
01.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
29.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
25.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
16.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
03.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
05.11.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
29.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication