blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0978207
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0978207Global Dossier 04.06.2003B1
EP0978207 09.02.2000A2
Priority number Date
US83762197 21.04.1997
IB9800595 21.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU6742598 13.11.1998A
Priority number Date
US83762197 21.04.1997
IB9800595 21.04.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69815337T 22.04.2004T2
DE69815337D 10.07.2003D1
Priority number Date
US83762197 21.04.1997
IB9800595 21.04.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9848579Global Dossier 28.01.1999A3
WO9848579 29.10.1998A2
Priority number Date
US83762197 21.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5828961 27.10.1998A
Priority number Date
US83762197 21.04.1997