blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0978207

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
Examination procedure05.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase22.11.1999National basic fee paid 
22.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted04.06.2003
Opposition procedure05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit published on 26.05.2004 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:09.02.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:09.02.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19991122
 
Event date:27.09.2000 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:NORTEL NETWORKS LIMITED
 
Event date:04.06.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:04.06.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:10.07.2003 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69815337
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20030710
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:17.09.2003 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:NORTEL NETWORKS LIMITED
 
Event date:19.03.2004 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:21.04.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20040421
 
Event date:26.05.2004 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20040305
 
Event date:03.11.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20041103
 
Event date:08.12.2004 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20040421
 
Event date:31.12.2004 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20041231
 
Event date:04.02.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE