Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978207

EP0978207 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PARTITIONING A CELLULAR ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St.Laurent
Québec H4S 2A9 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2003/38]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St.Laurent, Québec H4S 2A9 / CA
Former [2003/23]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor
Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor
Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION
World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8th Floor
Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / SUBRAMAMIAN, Sairam
2710 Francisco Drive
Garland, TX 75044 / US
02 / MADHAVAPEDDY, Seshagiri, Rao
1921 Big Hara Lane
Richardson, TX 75068 / US
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Stainthorpe, Vanessa Juliet
HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/15]Stainthorpe, Vanessa J.
Harrison Goddard Foote, Fountain Precinct, Leopold Street
Sheffield S1 2QD / GB
Former [2002/35]Harrison Goddard Foote
Orlando House 11c Compstall Road Marple Bridge
Stockport SK6 5HH / GB
Former [2001/31]Jones, Keith William , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote Orlando House 11c Compstall Road Marple Bridge
Stockport SK6 5HH / GB
Former [2000/06]Berkson, Michael David , et al
Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road
Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB
Application number, filing date98912661.021.04.1998
[2000/06]
WO1998IB00595
Priority number, dateUS1997083762121.04.1997         Original published format: US 837621
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9848579
Date:29.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978207
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1998
[2000/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978207
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04Q7/36
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/06]
TitleGerman:SYTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUFTEILUNG EINER ZELLULAREN UMGEBUNG[2000/06]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PARTITIONING A CELLULAR ENVIRONMENT[2000/06]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR DIVISER UN ENVIRONNEMENT CELLULAIRE[2000/06]
Entry into regional phase22.11.1999National basic fee paid 
22.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
31.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.2003Fee for grant paid
05.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0685973  (AT & T CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column A * * column 6, line 55 - line 58 * * column 10, line 35 - column 11, line 31 * * column 12, line 57 - column 14, line 4 * * figures 3,7 *;
 [A]  - AGRAWAL P ET AL, "A NETWORK FLOW FRAMEWORK FOR ONLINE DYNAMIC CHANNEL ALLOCATION", COMMUNICATIONS: THE KEY TO GLOBAL PROSPERITY. GLOBECOM 1996, LONDON, NOV. 18 - 22, 1996, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19961118), vol. 1, pages 229 - 234, XP000742157 [A] 1 * the whole document *