Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1021471

EP1021471 - AMPHOLYTE POLYMERS FOR USE IN PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.07.2008
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.05.2009Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES
published on 10.06.2009  [2009/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Calgon Corporation
P.O. Box 1346
Pittsburgh, PA 15230 / US
[2000/30]
Inventor(s)01 / MELBY, Allan, L.
104 Heathercroft Drive
Cranberry Township, PA 16066 / US
02 / LaMAR, Richard
854 Donegal Drive East
Follansbee, West Virginia 26307 / US
03 / VOZZA, Nicholas, F.
375 Maple Road
Burgettstown, PA 15021 / US
04 / MATZ, Gary, F.
207 Alden Road
Carnegie, PA 15106 / US
[2000/41]
Former [2000/30]01 / MELBY, Allan, L.
104 Heathercroft Drive
Cranberry Township, PA 16066 / US
02 / LaMAR, Richard
291 New York Boulevard
Weirton, WV 26062 / US
03 / VOZZA, Nicholas, F.
375 Maple Road
Burgettstown, PA 15021 / US
04 / MATZ, Gary, F.
207 Alden Road
Carnegie, PA 15106 / US
Representative(s)Geissler, Bernhard , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Geissler, Bernhard, Dr.jur., Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patent- u. Rechtsanwälte Bardehle -Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg- Geissler-Isenbruck Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date98912665.131.03.1998
[2000/30]
WO1998IB00599
Priority number, dateUS1997082849531.03.1997         Original published format: US 828495
[2000/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844012
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1021471
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1021471
Date:29.08.2007
Language:EN
[2007/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C08F220/06, C08F220/60, A61K8/00
[2007/17]
Former International [2000/30]C08F220/06, C08F220/60, A61K7/00
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL [2000/30]
TitleGerman:AMPHOLITISCHE POLYMERE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN KÖRPERPFLEGEPRODUKTEN[2000/30]
English:AMPHOLYTE POLYMERS FOR USE IN PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS[2000/30]
French:POLYMERES AMPHOTERES POUR PRODUITS D'HYGIENE CORPORELLE[2000/30]
Entry into regional phase21.10.1999National basic fee paid 
21.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/30]
11.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
11.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
21.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2007Date of oral proceedings
27.02.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
05.03.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.2007Fee for grant paid
16.07.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.05.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/32]
Request for further processing for:21.03.2006Request for further processing filed
21.03.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.04.2006Decision despatched
21.11.2003Request for further processing filed
21.11.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.01.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL29.08.2007
[2009/24]
Former [2008/15]NL29.08.2007
ES10.12.2007
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9322358  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1,7 *;
 [X]EP0272472  (WELLA AG [DE]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [DX]DE4401708  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [DX] 1 * claims 1,8 *