Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973515

EP0973515 - SOLID COMPOSITIONS SUITABLE FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION COMPRISING AN ALKANOYL-L-CARNITINE MAGNESIUM CITRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.11.2003
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.01.2004  [2004/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIGMA-TAU Industrie Farmaceutiche Riunite S.p.A.
Viale Shakespeare, 47
00144 Roma / IT
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
SIGMA-TAU Industrie Farmaceutiche Riunite S.p.A.
Viale Shakespeare, 47
00144 Roma / IT
Inventor(s)01 / SCAFETTA, Nazareno
Via Siena, 10
I-00040 Pavona di Albano / IT
02 / TINTI, Maria, Ornella
Via Ernesto Basile, 81
I-00182 Rome / IT
[2000/04]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2002/22]
Former [2000/04]Spadaro, Marco , et al
Sigma-Tau Industrie Farmaceutiche Riunite SpA, 47,Viale Shakespeare
00144 Rome / IT
Application number, filing date98912693.319.03.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998IT00058
Priority number, dateIT1997RM0019808.04.1997         Original published format: IT RM970198
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844918
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973515
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973515
Date:08.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/205, C07C59/265, A23L1/30, A23K1/16, C07C229/22
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
Extension statesAL30.09.1999
LT30.09.1999
LV30.09.1999
MK30.09.1999
RO30.09.1999
SI30.09.1999
TitleGerman:FESTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, DIE ALKANOYL-L-CARNITIN-MAGNESIUM-ZITRAT ENTHALTEN, ZUR ORALEN VERABREICHUNG[2002/12]
English:SOLID COMPOSITIONS SUITABLE FOR ORAL ADMINISTRATION COMPRISING AN ALKANOYL-L-CARNITINE MAGNESIUM CITRATE[2000/04]
French:COMPOSITIONS SOLIDES ADAPTEES A L'ADMINISTRATION PAR VOIE ORALE, CONTENANT UN CITRATE DE MAGNESIUM D'ALCANOYLE-L-CARNITINE[2000/04]
Former [2000/04]FESTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR ORALE VERABREICHUNG DIE ALKANOYL-L-CARNITIN-MAGNESIUM-ZITRAT ENTHALTEN
Entry into regional phase30.09.1999National basic fee paid 
30.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
30.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
29.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
23.05.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.2002Fee for grant paid
14.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
11.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200205   M06   Fee paid on   11.06.2002
Cited inInternational search[AD]EP0434088  (LONZA AG [CH]) [AD] 1-10 * claim - *;
 [A]EP0402755  (LONZA AG [CH]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0628309  (AVANTGARDE SPA [IT]) [A] 1-10 * claim - *;
 [A]FR2529545  (SANOFI SA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * claim - *;
 [A]US4602039  (CAVAZZA CLAUDIO [IT]) [A] 1-10 * claim - *;
 [A]GB1153640  (SOC D ETUDES PROD CHIMIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *