blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0930639 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0930639



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 106
04.05.2005 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
21.05.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.03.2004 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
16.02.2004 Communication concerning missing translation(s) of priority document(s) Search / examination 1
19.09.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.09.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
19.09.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
04.09.2003 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
27.08.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.08.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
27.08.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 7
24.04.2003 Claims Search / examination 1
24.04.2003 Description Search / examination 4
24.04.2003 Drawings Search / examination 1
24.04.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
05.03.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.02.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.12.2002 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
30.10.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
30.10.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.07.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
06.07.2002 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
06.07.2002 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
06.07.2002 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
02.07.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
21.06.2002 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
20.12.2000 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
20.12.2000 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
14.06.2000 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.05.2000 Request for change of representative Search / examination 2
18.01.2000 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
08.12.1999 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
02.12.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
02.12.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.12.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
09.06.1999 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
03.02.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
19.11.1998 Priority document Search / examination 16
22.10.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.10.1998 Claims Search / examination 1
22.10.1998 Description Search / examination 5
22.10.1998 Drawings Search / examination 2
22.10.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
15.10.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
15.10.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 10