blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0930639


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
06.05.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  22.06.2005  [2005/25]
14.05.2004 (Expected) grant published on  30.06.2004  [2004/27]
14.05.2004 Change - inventor published on  30.06.2004  [2004/27]
07.05.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.09.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
27.09.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
02.09.2003 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.05.2003 Renewal fee
30.04.2003 Examination report or reply
26.02.2003 Examination report or reply
01.11.2002 First examination report
25.10.2002 Examination report or reply
19.07.2002 Change - applicant published on  04.09.2002  [2002/36]
28.06.2002 Change - representative published on  14.08.2002  [2002/33]
07.05.2002 Renewal fee
10.05.2001 Renewal fee
09.06.2000 Change - representative published on  26.07.2000 [2000/30]
09.05.2000 Renewal fee
03.12.1999 Supplementary search report published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]
04.06.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  21.07.1999 [1999/29]
04.06.1999 Request for examination filed published on  21.07.1999 [1999/29]
11.05.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
20.04.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
08.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
04.02.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
04.11.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
29.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication