blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0930639
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0930639Global Dossier 30.06.2004B1
EP0930639 19.01.2000A4
EP0930639 21.07.1999A1
Priority number Date
JP9801625 08.04.1998
JP10834597 11.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69824824T 07.07.2005T2
DE69824824D 05.08.2004D1
Priority number Date
JP9801625 08.04.1998
JP10834597 11.04.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6271627 07.08.2001B1
Priority number Date
JP9801625 08.04.1998
JP10834597 11.04.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9847169Global Dossier 22.10.1998A1
Priority number Date
JP10834597 11.04.1997