blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0930639

Designated contracting states DE 
 NL 
Examination procedure19.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase22.10.1998Translation filed 
22.10.1998National basic fee paid 
22.10.1998Search fee paid 
08.04.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
09.04.1999Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
27.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
European patent granted30.06.2004
Opposition procedure31.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit published on 15.06.2005 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:21.07.1999 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE NL
 
Event date:21.07.1999 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19990409
 
Event date:19.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A4
Designated State(s):DE NL
 
Event date:19.01.2000 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19991202
 
Event date:04.09.2002 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:USHIO DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISYA
 
Event date:04.09.2002 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:TOTO LTD.
 
Event date:18.12.2002 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20021030
 
Event date:30.06.2004 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:MORIMOTO, YUKIHIRO
 
Event date:30.06.2004 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:MORI, KAZUYUKI
 
Event date:30.06.2004 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:MITUHASHI, KENICHI
 
Event date:30.06.2004 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:MIYANAGA, SHOJI
 
Event date:30.06.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE NL
 
Event date:05.08.2004 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69824824
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20040805
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:22.06.2005 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20050331
 
Event date:27.04.2007 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20070427
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:31.01.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20070824
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:05.01.2009 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20081101
 
Event date:30.01.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20081101
 
Event date:30.01.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20081101