Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0930639

EP0930639 - SEAL OF BULB [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.05.2005
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.05.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.06.2005  [2005/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
USHIO DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISYA
Asahitokai Building 19th floor, 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 100-0004 / JP
For all designated states
TOTO LTD.
1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokura-kita-ku Kita Kyushu-shi
Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/27]For all designated states
USHIO DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISYA
Asahitokai Building 19th floor, 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 100-0004 / JP
For all designated states
Toto Ltd.
1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokura-kita-ku
Kita Kyushu-shi Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
USHIO DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISYA
Asahitokai Building 19th floor, 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 100-0004 / JP
For all designated states
Toto Ltd.
1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokura-kita-ku
Kita Kyushu-shi Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP
Former [1999/29]For all designated states
USHIO DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISYA
Asahitokai Building 19th floor, 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo, 100-0004 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MORIMOTO, Yukihiro
77, Doshinmachi
Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-0856 / JP
02 / MORI, Kazuyuki
22-5-203, Taderahigashi 2-chome Himeji-shi
Hyogo 671-0217 / JP
03 / MITUHASHI, Kenichi
16-4-401, Azuma 4-chome
Tukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0031 / JP
04 / MIYANAGA, Shoji
148-1, Yonedacyoshima
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0807 / JP
 [2004/27]
Former [1999/29]01 / MORIMOTO, Yukihiro
77, Doshinmachi
Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-0856 / JP
02 / MORI, Kazuyuki
22-5-203, Taderahigashi 2-chome Himeji-shi
Hyogo 671-0217 / JP
03 / MITUHASHI, Kenichi
16-4-401, Azuma 4-chome
Tukuba-shi Ibaragi 305-0031 / JP
04 / MIYANAGA, Syoji
148-1, Yonedacyoshima
Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-0807 / JP
Representative(s)Tomerius, Isabel , et al
Lang & Tomerius
Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/33]Tomerius, Isabel, Dr. , et al
Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Postfach 151324
80048 München / DE
Former [2000/30]Tomerius, Isabel , et al
Patentanwälte Weber & Heim Bavariaring 29
80336 München / DE
Former [1999/29]Tomerius, Isabel, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte Weber & Heim, Irmgardstrasse 3
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date98912728.708.04.1998
[1999/29]
WO1998JP01625
Priority number, dateJP1997010834511.04.1997         Original published format: JP 10834597
[1999/29]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9847169
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0930639
Date:21.07.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[1999/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0930639
Date:30.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01J61/36
[1999/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   NL [1999/29]
TitleGerman:DICHTUNG EINES LAMPENKOLBEN[1999/29]
English:SEAL OF BULB[1999/29]
French:JOINT D'AMPOULE[1999/29]
Entry into regional phase22.10.1998Translation filed 
22.10.1998National basic fee paid 
22.10.1998Search fee paid 
08.04.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
09.04.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/29]
30.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2003Fee for grant paid
19.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
27.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR2700061  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 21 * * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 13 * * page 4, line 10 - line 14 * * page 5, line 9 - line 27 *;
 [Y]GB1442497  (THORN ELECTRICAL IND LTD) [Y] 1,2 * page 1, line 25 - line 33; claim 1 * * page 1, line 68 - line 81; figure - * * page 1, line 90 - page 2, line 12 *;
 [Y]US3753026  (GOORISSEN J) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * column 1, line 38 - line 61 *;
 [Y]US4074167  (VAN DEN BROEK CORNELIS PIETER, et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 4, line 25 - line 55; figure 1 *
International search[XE]JPH10125284  (TOTO LTD);
 [Y]WO9406947  (TOTO LTD [JP], et al);
 [Y]JPH0877976  (TOTO LTD);
 [Y]JPS5967855U  ;
 [AE]JPH10172514  (TOTO LTD);
 [AP]JPH1040867  (USHIO ELECTRIC INC);
 [AP]JPH1040868  (USHIO ELECTRIC INC [JP]);
 [AP]JPH1040869  (USHIO ELECTRIC INC);
 [AP]JPH09125186  (TOTO LTD);
 [AP]JPH09115484  (TOTO LTD)