Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974014

EP0974014 - DOUBLE-ACTING SHOCK ABSORBER WITH VOLUME COMPENSATION FOR THE STROKE OF THE ROD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.12.2002
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.12.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.02.2003  [2003/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KONI B.V.
Langeweg 1 P.O. Box 1014
NL-3260 AA Oud-Beijerland / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
KONI B.V.
Langeweg 1 P.O. Box 1014
NL-3260 AA Oud-Beijerland / NL
Inventor(s)01 / KARS, Jan, Willem
Everocken 11
NL-3271 AD Mijnsheerenland / NL
[2000/04]
Representative(s)de Bruijn, Leendert C.
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]de Bruijn, Leendert C.
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date98912805.303.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998NL00185
Priority number, dateNL1997100576508.04.1997         Original published format: NL 1005765
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845614
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974014
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974014
Date:13.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:F16F9/18
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/04]
TitleGerman:DOPPELTWIRKENDER DÄMPFER MIT VOLUMENAUSGLEICH FÜR DEN HUB DER STANGE[2000/04]
English:DOUBLE-ACTING SHOCK ABSORBER WITH VOLUME COMPENSATION FOR THE STROKE OF THE ROD[2000/04]
French:AMORTISSEUR A DOUBLE ACTION AVEC COMPENSATION DE VOLUME DESTINEE A LA COURSE DE LA TIGE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase07.09.1999National basic fee paid 
07.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
22.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.2001Fee for grant paid
11.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US2057893  (WALTER GROSS) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]BE509363  (N.PAULY) [A] 1 * figure . *;
 [A]US1727121  (HAINES GLEN H) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2728419  (CRABTREE GEORGE W) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3934386  (HEMSCHEIDT MASCHF HERMANN [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US2649936  (CRABTREE GEORGE W) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0607545  (OEHLINS RACING AB [SE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2132313  (FOKKER BV);
 [A]US2533226  (DAVIS HAROLD W, et al);
 [A]DE3932287  (HEMSCHEIDT MASCHF HERMANN [DE]);
 [A]EP0220370  (RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE])