Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975488

EP0975488 - INTERIOR REARVIEW MIRROR FOR A VEHICLE, AND ACTUATOR FOR AN INTERIOR REARVIEW MIRROR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.09.2003
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.04.2008  [2008/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IKU Holding Montfoort B.V.
Waardsedijk Oost 9
3417 XJ Montfoort / NL
[2000/05]
Inventor(s)01 / BROUWER, Stefan, Frits
2e Sweelinckstraat 90
NL-2517 GZ Den Haag / NL
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2003/15]Prins, Adrianus Willem , et al
Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN Den Haag / NL
Former [2000/05]Ottevangers, Sietse Ulbe , et al
Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97
2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL
Application number, filing date98912811.106.04.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998NL00191
Priority number, dateNL1997100581715.04.1997         Original published format: NL 1005817
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9846451
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975488
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975488
Date:30.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:B60R1/04
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:INNENRÜCKBLICKSPIEGEL FÜR FAHRZEUGE UND ANTRIEB FÜR EINEN INNENRÜCKBLICKSPIEGEL[2000/05]
English:INTERIOR REARVIEW MIRROR FOR A VEHICLE, AND ACTUATOR FOR AN INTERIOR REARVIEW MIRROR[2000/05]
French:RETROVISEUR INTERIEUR DE VEHICULE ET ACTIONNEUR DESTINE A CELUI-CI[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase13.10.1999National basic fee paid 
13.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
15.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2002Fee for grant paid
04.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.07.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
08.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200104   M06   Fee paid on   06.08.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.10.2002
IT30.10.2002
SE30.01.2003
ES29.04.2003
[2008/15]
Former [2004/04]AT30.10.2002
SE30.01.2003
ES29.04.2003
Former [2003/37]AT30.10.2002
SE30.01.2003
Former [2003/27]SE30.01.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]US2664785  (ROEHRIG FREDERICK L O) [A] 1,27,28 * column W *;
 [A]EP0287181  (IKU HOLDING MONTFOORT BV [NL])