EP0973426 - PULL-UP CURTAIN STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUNTER DOUGLAS INDUSTRIES B.V. Piekstraat 2 3071 EL Rotterdam / NL | [2002/10] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states Dutch Trading Dutra B.V. Het Lenfert 51 7547 Enschede / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER MEIJDEN, Hans, Martin Nijenkerckestraat 23 NL-7482 ZX Haaksbergen / NL | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Schapira, Ronald Allen Hunter Douglas Industries B.V. 2, Piekstraat 3071 EL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/10] | Schapira, Ronald Allen Hunter Douglas Industries B.V. 2, Piekstraat 3071 EL Rotterdam / NL | ||
Former [2000/04] | Schumann, Bernard Herman Johan Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 98912820.2 | 08.04.1998 | [2000/04] | WO1998NL00200 | Priority number, date | NL19971005794 | 11.04.1997 Original published format: NL 1005794 | [2000/04] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9846109 | Date: | 22.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0973426 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A47H5/14, E06B9/262 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
E06B9/262 (EP);
E06B2009/2622 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/04] | Title | German: | HOCHZIEHBARE VORHANGSTRUKTUR | [2000/04] | English: | PULL-UP CURTAIN STRUCTURE | [2000/04] | French: | STRUCTURE DE STORE A LA ROMAINE | [2000/04] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.1998 | Translation filed | 17.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.08.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 30.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/46] | 16.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2000 | 30.04.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3777800 (SUSOEV Y) [Y] 1,3-6,8,9 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5560414 (JUDKINS REN ET AL) [Y] 1,3-6,8,9 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 19; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE8802688U (AUTEX JACOB & CO.) [A] 1,2,6,7 * the whole document * |