Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969990

EP0969990 - REINFORCEMENT MEANS FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AB VOLVO
405 08 Göteborg / SE
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / GYLLENSPETZ, Per
Spelmansgatan 8
S-416 52 Göteborg / SE
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Mossmark, Anders Lennart , et al
Zacco Sweden AB
Torggatan 8
Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Mossmark, Anders , et al
Albihns Patentbyra Göteborg AB P.O.Box 142
401 22 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date98912872.326.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998SE00581
Priority number, dateSE1997000115127.03.1997         Original published format: SE 9701151
[2000/02]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843854
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969990
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969990
Date:21.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:B60R21/06, B60R21/13
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/02]
TitleGerman:VERSTÄRKUNGSELEMENTE FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG[2000/02]
English:REINFORCEMENT MEANS FOR VEHICLE[2000/02]
French:MOYEN DE RENFORCEMENT DESTINE A UN VEHICULE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase08.10.1998Translation filed 
23.09.1999National basic fee paid 
23.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
23.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
15.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.2003Fee for grant paid
19.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
20.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200104   M06   Fee paid on   23.07.2001
Cited inInternational search[A]US4592571  ;
 [A]EP0432824  ;
 [A]WO9704991  ;
 [A]DE2166310  ;
 [A]SE503377