Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991812

EP0991812 - METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF CELLULOSE PULP, CELLULOSE PULP TO BE USED IN ABSORPTION PRODUCTS, AND ABSORPTION PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.03.2005
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.05.2005  [2005/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stora Enso Aktiebolag
791 80 Falun / SE
[2004/02]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
STORA KOPPARBERGS BERGSLAGS AKTIEBOLAG(publ)
Asgatan 22
S-791 80 Falun / SE
Inventor(s)01 / NORLANDER, Leif
Länsmansvägen 7
S-791 61 Falun / SE
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Johansson, Lars E. , et al
Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2
683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2002/51]Johansson, Lars E. , et al
Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls Väg 2
683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE
Former [2000/15]Hynell, Magnus
Hynell Patenttjänst AB, Patron Carls väg 2
683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE
Application number, filing date98912873.130.03.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998SE00585
Priority number, dateSE1997000171107.05.1997         Original published format: SE 9701711
[2000/15]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9850629
Date:12.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0991812
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991812
Date:12.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE12.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:D21H17/66, A61L15/18, // D21C9/00, D21H21/14
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR [2000/15]
Extension statesLT09.09.1999
LV09.09.1999
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ZELLSTOFFHERSTELLUNG, ZELLSTOFF FÜR SAUGFÄHIGE PRODUKTE UND SAUGFÄHIGE PRODUKTE[2000/15]
English:METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF CELLULOSE PULP, CELLULOSE PULP TO BE USED IN ABSORPTION PRODUCTS, AND ABSORPTION PRODUCT[2000/15]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE PATE A PAPIER, PATE A PAPIER DESTINEE A ETRE UTILISEE DANS DES PRODUITS ABSORBANTS ET PRODUIT ABSORBANT[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase12.11.1998Translation filed 
09.09.1999National basic fee paid 
09.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
09.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
15.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2004Fee for grant paid
17.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[A]SU1261996  ;
 [A]WO9105108  (SCA RESEARCH AB [SE]);
 [A]WO9105106  (SCA RESEARCH AB [SE])
 [A]  - FILE WPI, Derwent Accession No. 87-149264, LENGD FORESTRY ACAD., "Prepn. of Paper from Pulp - Involves Using Potash Alum and/or Aluminium Sulphate to Increase Absorbency while Maintaining Wet Strength"; & SU,A,1 261 996 (07-10-86) DW8721.,