Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968457

EP0968457 - IMPROVED MICROENCAPSULATED ELECTROPHORETIC DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.03.2008
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / JACOBSON, Joseph, M.
Apartment 1 31 Linnaean Street
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
02 / COMISKEY, Barrett
50 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
03 / ALBERT, Jonathan
69 Chestnut Street
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Hackett, Sean James
Marks & Clerk LLP
Alpha Tower
Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Hackett, Sean James
Marks & Clerk, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Application number, filing date98912920.012.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998US04705
Priority number, dateUS1997081932018.03.1997         Original published format: US 819320
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9841899
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0968457
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968457
Date:16.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/167
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/01]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTE ELEKTROPHORTISCHE ANZEIGE IM MIKROGEHÄUSE[2000/01]
English:IMPROVED MICROENCAPSULATED ELECTROPHORETIC DISPLAY[2000/01]
French:AFFICHEUR ELECTROPHORETIQUE MICRO-ENCAPSULE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase21.09.1999National basic fee paid 
21.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.09.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
06.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2007Fee for grant paid
07.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.02.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[Y]JPS6486116  ;
 [Y]GB1465701  (PLESSEY) [Y] 1,2 * page 1, line 34 - page 3, line 36 *;
 [Y]US4305807  (SOMLYODY) [Y] 14,15 * column 2, line 41 - line 68 *;
 [Y]JPS62299824  ;
 [A]JPS62269124  ;
 [A]JPS60189731  ;
 [A]WO8202961  (PATSCENTRE BENELUX) [A] 7 * page 2, line 04 - line 28 *;
 [Y]WO9704398  (JACOBSON) [Y] 30,31 * page 7, line 09 - line 32 * * page 13, line 02 - page 16, line 02 *;
 [A]JPH01267525  ;
 [XYA]US3792308  (MATSUSHITA) [X] 29 * column 18, line 39 - column 19, line 05; figure 14 * * column 17, line 34 - line 63; figures 12A,,12B * * column 3, line 06 - column 4, line 56 * [Y] 28 [A] 24,25
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 316, Database accession no. (P - 900), & JP01086116 A 19890330 (MEKTRON) [Y] 1,2,14,15,24,25,28,30,31 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 194, Database accession no. (P - 713), & JP62299824 A 19871226 (RICOH) [Y] 24,25 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 151, Database accession no. (P - 699), & JP62269124 A 19871121 (RICOH) [A] 12 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 45, Database accession no. (P - 430), & JP60189731 A 19850927 (NIPPON PAINT) [A] 16 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 14, no. 27, Database accession no. (P - 992), & JP01267525 A 19891025 (TOYOTA) [A] 18 * abstract *