Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970334

EP0970334 - COAXIAL WAVEGUIDE APPLICATOR FOR AN ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVE-ACTIVATED SORPTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.06.2003
Database last updated on 19.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.07.2003  [2003/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
901 San Antonio Road
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
901 San Antonio Road
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PFISTER, Dennis, M.
1301 Dogwood Trail
Conway, AR 72032 / US
02 / BYRD, Charles, M.
400 Valencia 1222
Maumelle, AR 72113 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Haines, Miles John L.S. , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Haines, Miles John , et al
D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date98912980.420.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998US05460
Priority number, dateUS1997082608620.03.1997         Original published format: US 826086
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9841800
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970334
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:F25B35/04, H05B6/70
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:KOAXIALES WELLENLEITERGERÄT FÜR EINE VON ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN WELLEN ANGETRIEBENER SORPTIONSANLAGE[2000/02]
English:COAXIAL WAVEGUIDE APPLICATOR FOR AN ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVE-ACTIVATED SORPTION SYSTEM[2000/02]
French:APPLICATEUR DE GUIDE D'ONDES COAXIAL DESTINE A UN SYSTEME DE SORPTION ELECTROMAGNETIQUE ACTIVE PAR ONDES[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase18.10.1999National basic fee paid 
18.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
18.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
28.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/30]
12.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
05.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US5333471  (YAMADA YASUO [JP]) [A] 1,2,12 * column 4, line 45 - column 15, line 8; figure 14 *;
 [A]FR2666141  (BOURGOGNE TECHNOLOGIES [FR]) [A] 1,2,12 * page 5, line 21 - page 9, line 9; figures 2-4 *;
 [A]US5222543  (CARLSTROM BENGT I [AT], et al) [A] 1,2,12 * column 3, line 12 - column 8, line 41; figures 1-5 *;
 [DA]US5216327  (MYERS IRA J [US], et al) [DA] 1-5,12 * column 2, line 65 - column 5, line 60; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4889965  (GERVAIS PIERRE [CA], et al) [A] 1-3,7,12,13,15,19 * column 3, line 17 - column 7, line 8; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US4399341  (YASUOKA YOSHIO [JP]) [A] 6,18 * column 4, line 15 - column 10, line 68; figures 1-19 *;
 [A]US2326130  (AF KLEEN NILS ERLAND) [A] 27,29 * page 3, column L, line 11 - page 4, column L, line 15; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]FR2703763  (SOFRIGAM [FR]);
 [A]US2138685  (EDMUND ALTENKIRCH);
 [A]US4312640  (VERRANDO MARCEL G);
 [A]US5274347  (BOBADILLA OMAR J [US]);
 [A]US5223809  (MYER ROBERT E [US])