Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970469

EP0970469 - CUSTOMIZED GRAPHICS FOR OPTICAL DISCS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.10.2003
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Imation Corp.
1 Imation Place, P.O. Box 64898
St. Paul, Minnesota 55164-0898 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Imation Corp.
1 Imation Place, P.O. Box 64898
St. Paul, Minnesota 55164-0898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BAHNS, Ted, L.
P.O. Box 64898
Saint Paul, MN 55164-0898 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2000/02]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date98912997.819.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998US05512
Priority number, dateUS1997082124020.03.1997         Original published format: US 821240
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9841983
Date:24.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970469
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970469
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:G11B7/24, G11B7/26, G11B23/40
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2000/02]
TitleGerman:ANWENDERSPEZIFISCHE GRAPHIKEN FÜR OPTISCHE PLATTEN[2000/02]
English:CUSTOMIZED GRAPHICS FOR OPTICAL DISCS[2000/02]
French:GRAPHIQUES SUR MESURE POUR DISQUES OPTIQUES[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase14.10.1999National basic fee paid 
14.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
05.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
23.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
04.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.2002Fee for grant paid
11.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR11.12.2002
[2006/14]
Cited inInternational search[YA]EP0762407  (WEA MFG INC [US]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 39 * * column 5, line 11 - line 55 * [A] 6-8,10;
 [Y]EP0682341  (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * column 7, line 20 - line 34 * * column 11, line 36 - column 12, line 43 *;
 [XA]US5452282  (ABRAHAM NIGEL C [GB]) [X] 6,7,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 59 - column 4, line 26 * [A] 1,8,9;
 [XA]WO9410684  (PMDC INC [US], et al) [X] 6,7,10 * abstract * * page 11, line 14 - page 15, line 10 * * page 8, line 22 - page 10, line 27 * [A] 1-5,8,9;
 [PX]EP0818782  (WEA MFG INC [US]) [PX] 1,2,6,7,9,10 * abstract * * column 3, line 17 - column 7, line 21 *;
 [A]US5346654  (KODAKA ICHIRO [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 4, line 54 - column 6, line 37 *