EP0967887 - STARCH WITH REDUCED AMYLOSE CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Limagrain Agro-Industrie SA Rue Limagrain, Bôite Postale 1 63720 Chappes / FR | [2001/50] |
Former [2000/01] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIVERMORE, Martin 17A West End Whittlesford, Cambridge CB2 4LX / GB | 02 /
FRAZIER, Peter John 5 Scotts Close, Hilton Huntingdon, Cambridgeshire PE18 9PQ / GB | 03 /
FITCHETT, Colin, Stanley 13 Sedgwick Street Cambridge CB1 3AJ / GB | 04 /
FORGE, Charles Douglas 37 The Oaks Milton, Cambridge CB4 6ZG / GB | [2000/01] | Representative(s) | Fleurance, Raphaël, et al Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | Fleurance, Raphael, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/01] | White, Martin Paul, et al Fry Heath & Spence, The Old College, 53 High Street Horley, Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 98913008.3 | 19.03.1998 | [2000/01] | WO1998US05546 | Priority number, date | GB19970005746 | 20.03.1997 Original published format: GB 9705746 | [2000/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9841111 | Date: | 24.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0967887 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/0522, A23L1/39, A21D2/18 | [2000/01] | CPC: |
A21D2/186 (EP);
A23D7/0056 (EP);
A23K50/40 (EP);
A23L23/00 (EP);
A23L29/212 (EP);
A23L29/35 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/01] | Title | German: | STÄRKE MIT REDUZIERTEM AMYLOSEGEHALT | [2000/01] | English: | STARCH WITH REDUCED AMYLOSE CONTENT | [2000/01] | French: | AMIDON PRESENTANT UNE TENEUR LIMITEE EN AMYLOSE | [2000/01] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 10.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M14) | 21.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/26] | 24.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9535026 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-11,13-15,17-19 * claims 1-9,18-35 * * page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 13, line 393 - page 16, line 456 * * page 18 - page 19; table 2 * * table 3 * * example 14 *; | [X]EP0521621 (CAMBRIDGE ADVANCED TECH [GB]) [X] 1-11,13-15,17 * the whole document *; | [X]US5576048 (HAUBER RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13-15,17-19 * examples 1,2 *; | [X]US4801470 (FRIEDMAN ROBERT B [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13-15,17 * table I *; | [X]US4767849 (FRIEDMAN ROBERT B [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13-15,17 * table I *; | [X]US4789738 (FRIEDMAN ROBERT B [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13-15,17 * table I *; | [X]US4615888 (ZALLIE JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12,16,17 * column W *; | [PA]WO9745545 (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH [DE], et al) [PA] 1-19 * page 18, paragraph 5 - page 20, paragraph 2 * * page 26, paragraph 4 - page 27, paragraph 2 * * page 29, paragraph 2 - page 30, paragraph 1 * * page 31, paragraph 3 * * claims 27,28 *; | [PX]WO9716554 (INNES JOHN CENTRE INNOV LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1-15,18,19 * claims 1,2,6-8,23,25 * * page 5, line 19 - page 6, line 16 * * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 16 * * page 26, line 26 - page 27, line 5 *; | [PX]JPH09191818 ; | [E]WO9815621 (EXSEED GENETICS LLC [US], et al) [E] 1-17 * page 5 * * page 12 * * page 22, paragraph 2 * | [X] - M.ZENG, C.MORRIS, I.BATEY, C.WRIGLEY, CEREAL CHEMISTRY., MINNEAPOLIS US, (1997), vol. 74, no. 1, pages 63 - 71, XP002050479 [X] 1-10,17 * the whole document * | [X] - NAKAMURA T ET AL, "Production of waxy (amylose-free) wheats.", FSTA, INTERNATIONAL FOOD INFORMATION SERVICE (IFIS), FRANFURT/MAIN, DE, XP002068708 [X] 1-17 * abstract * | [ ] - MOLECULAR & GENERAL GENETICS, TOHOKU NAT. AGRIC. EXP. STA., AKAHIRA 4, MORIOKA, IWATE 020-01, JAPAN, (1995), vol. 248, no. 3, pages 253 - 259 | [A] - H.MIURA, A.SUGAWARA, "Dosage Effects of the Three Wx Genes on Amylose Synthesis in Wheat Endosperm", THEOR. APPL. GENET., (1996), vol. 93, no. 7, pages 1066 - 1070, XP002050480 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s001220050336 | [A] - H.D. GRAHAM, Food Colloids, USA, AVI, (1977), XP002067215 [A] 1 * Pages 472-479; page 472, paragraph 3 - page 473 * * page 477 - page 479, paragraph 2 * | [PX] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 40, Database accession no. 97-394031, XP002068704 & JPH09191818 A 00000000 (JAPAN MIN NAT FOOD AGRIC FORESTRY & FISH) [PX] 1-19 * abstract * |