Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1007535

EP1007535 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF BREAST CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.08.2004
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.10.2004  [2004/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MUSC Foundation For Research Development
171 Ashley Avenue
Charleston, SC 29425 / US
[2000/24]
Inventor(s)01 / VOURNAKIS, John, N.
19 Menotti Street
Charleston, SC 29401 / US
02 / SETH, Arun, K.
923 Drysdale Drive
Mississauga, Ontario L5V 1X6 / CA
03 / PAPAS, Takis, S.
84 C Bull Street
Charleston, SC 29401 / US
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98913038.020.03.1998
[2000/24]
WO1998US05629
Priority number, dateUS19970044425P21.03.1997         Original published format: US 44425 P
[2000/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842725
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1007535
Date:14.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07H21/02, C12P21/06, C07K1/00, C07K14/00
[2000/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/24]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND ZUBEREITUNGEN ZUR DIAGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG VON BRUSTKREBS[2000/24]
English:METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF BREAST CANCER[2000/24]
French:PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS DE DIAGNOSTIC ET DE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER DU SEIN[2000/24]
Entry into regional phase21.10.1999National basic fee paid 
21.10.1999Search fee paid 
21.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/24]
16.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/41]
03.05.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
05.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200205   M06   Fee paid on   05.09.2002
31.03.200306   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2003
31.03.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]  GENEXPRESS, "H. sapiens partial cDNA sequence; clone 56G07; strand (+), single read.", DATABASE EMBL, EBI, Database accession no. Z16011, XP002217693 [X] 1-7,11-15 * the whole document *
 [X]  GENEXPRESS, "H. sapiens partial cDNA sequence; clone 27A03; strand (+), single read.", DATABASE EMBL, EBI, Database accession no. Z15555, XP002217694 [X] 1-7,11-15 * the whole document *
 [X]  GENEXPRESS, "H. sapiens partial cDNA sequence; clone 68F07; strand (+), single read.", DATABASE EMBL, EBI, Database accession no. Z13711, XP002217695 [X] 1-7,11-15 * the whole document *
 [X]  GENEXPRESS, "H. sapiens partial cDNA sequence; clone 25H07; strand (+), single read.", DATABASE EMBL, EBI, Database accession no. Z13104, XP002217696 [X] 1-7,11-15 * the whole document *
 [X]  GENEXPRESS, "H. sapiens partial cDNA sequence; clone 08C08; strand (+), single read.", DATABASE EMBL, EBI, Database accession no. Z12846, XP002217697 [X] 1-7,11-15 * the whole document *
 [PX]  BURGER A M ET AL, "Detection of novel genes that are up-regulated (Di12) or down-regulated (T1A12) with disease progression in breast cancer.", DATABASE MEDLINE, Database accession no. NLM10866033, XP002217698 [PX] 41-57 * abstract *
    [] EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER PREVENTION: THE OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN CANCER PREVENTION ORGANISATION (ECP). ENGLAND FEB 1998, (199802), vol. 7 Suppl 1, ISSN 0959-8278, pages S29 - S35,
International search[XP]  - BURGER A., ET AL., "A NOVEL MEMBRANE PROTEIN ASSOCIATED WITH LATE STAGE BREAST CANCERS.", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY., GB, GB, (19970101), vol. 10., ISSN 0269-2139, page 80., XP002914256
 [YP]  - BURGER A. M., ET AL., "BREAST CANCER ASSOCIATED GENE DI12 CONFERS MAMMARY TUMOR FORMATION IN NUDE MICE.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 89TH. ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH. NEW ORLEANS, LA, MARCH 28 - APRIL 1, 1998., PHILADELPHIA, PA : AACR., US, US, (19980301), vol. 39., page 273., XP002914257
 [XP]  - BURGER A., ET AL., "BREAST CANCER GENOME ANATOMY: CORRELATION OF MORPHOLOGICAL CHANGES IN BREAST CARCINOMAS WITH EXPRESSION OF THE NOVEL GENE PRODUCT DI12.", Oncogene, Nature Publishing Group, GB, GB, (19980122), vol. 16., doi:10.1038/sj.onc.1201517, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 327 - 333., XP002914258

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1201517