Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969973

EP0969973 - MARKING INSTRUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.04.2003
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.05.2003  [2003/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Berol Corporation
29 E. Stephenson Street
Freeport, IL 61032 / US
[2001/24]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
The Gillette Company
Prudential Tower Building
Boston, MA 02199-8004 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STEVENS, Christopher, John
8 The Willows, Caversham
Reading, Berkshire RG4 8BD / GB
02 / SIMMS, Graham, John
Wachusett, Tokers Green Lane, Tokers Green
Reading, Berkshire RG4 9EB / GB
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
Ladas & Parry LLP
Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/09]Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Former [2000/02]Baillie, Iain Cameron
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date98913056.224.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998US05688
Priority number, dateGB1997000646127.03.1997         Original published format: GB 9706461
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843828
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969973
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969973
Date:05.06.2002
Language:EN
[2002/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:B43K7/12, B43K8/24
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/02]
TitleGerman:SCHREIBGERÄT[2000/02]
English:MARKING INSTRUMENTS[2000/02]
French:INSTRUMENTS DE MARQUAGE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase22.10.1999National basic fee paid 
22.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
14.02.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2001Fee for grant paid
05.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.03.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]US4544297  (GROSSIORD) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 43 - line 62 *;
 [A]US2946311  (CRAIG) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 50 - line 55 *;
 [A]US3594091  (BLEUER) [A] 1,17 * column 2, line 30 - line 38 *