Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972356

EP0972356 - COMBINED PARALLEL ADAPTIVE EQUALIZER/ECHO CANCELLER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.12.2002
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.2009Change - representativepublished on 13.01.2010  [2010/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LEVEL ONE COMMUNICATIONS, INC
9750 Goethe Road
Sacramento, CA 95827 / US
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / RAO, Sailesh, Krishna
8 Camby Drive
Colts Neck, NJ 07722 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Sigh, Erik
Zacco Denmark A/S
Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
[N/P]
Former [2010/02]Sigh, Erik
Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
Former [2000/03]Sigh, Erik
Hofman-Bang A/S, Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
Application number, filing date98913111.525.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998US05854
Priority number, dateUS19970042469P25.03.1997         Original published format: US 42469 P
US1997092406928.08.1997         Original published format: US 924069
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843369
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972356
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972356
Date:13.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04B3/23, H03H17/06
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:KOMBINIERTER PARALLELER ANPASSBARER ENTZERRER/ECHOUNTERDRÜCKER[2000/03]
English:COMBINED PARALLEL ADAPTIVE EQUALIZER/ECHO CANCELLER[2000/03]
French:EGALISEUR/COMPENSATEUR D'ECHO, COMBINE, EN PARALLELE ET ADAPTATIF[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase20.09.1999National basic fee paid 
20.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
23.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2001Fee for grant paid
19.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT13.02.2002
SE13.05.2002
[2008/15]
Former [2002/37]SE13.05.2002
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4074086  (FALCONER DAVID DUNCAN, et al) [Y] 1-7,10-13,16,17 * abstract *;
 [YA]EP0653839  (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-6,16 * page 7, line 31 - line 42; figure 8 * [A] 10-12;
 [Y]  - C.J. NICOL, P. LARSSON, K. AZADET, J. H. O' NEILL, "A Low Power 128-tap Digital Adaptive Equalizer for Broadband Modems", 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS CONFERENCE. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS, New York, USA, (19970206), pages 94 - 95,437, XP002073221 [Y] 1-7,10-13,16,17 * page 94, column 1, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *
 [A]  - MEYER M D, AGRAWAL D P, "A Modular Pipelined Implementation of a Delayed LMS Transversal Adaptive Filter", 1990 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSUIM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, New Orleans,LA,USA, (19900501), vol. 3, pages 1943 - 1946, XP002073222 [A] 7-9,13-15,17,18 * abstract * * column 1, line 21 - column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 10 *