Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971947

EP0971947 - RINK-CHLORIDE LINKER FOR SOLID PHASE ORGANIC SYNTHESIS OF ORGANIC MOLECULES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.02.2006
Database last updated on 09.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.02.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.03.2006  [2006/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia
Pennsylvania 19103 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929
Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GARIGIPATI, Ravi, S.
565 Quaker Lane 121
West Warwick, RI 02893 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Blakey, Alison Jane
GlaxoSmithKline
Corporate Intellectual Property
Two New Horizons Court
Brentford, Middlesex
TW8 9EP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Blakey, Alison Jane
Smithkline Beecham, Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court
Brentford, Middlesex, TW8 9EP / GB
Application number, filing date98913115.626.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998US05860
Priority number, dateUS19970044696P28.03.1997         Original published format: US 44696 P
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9844329
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0971947
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.12.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.2004
ClassificationInternational:C07K1/00, C08F8/00
[2005/04]
Former International [2000/03]C07K1/00
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VERBINDER AUF DER BASIS VON RINK-CHLORID FÜR DIE SYNTHESE VON ORGANISCHEN MOLEKÜLEN IN DER ORGANISCHEN FESTPHASE[2000/03]
English:RINK-CHLORIDE LINKER FOR SOLID PHASE ORGANIC SYNTHESIS OF ORGANIC MOLECULES[2000/03]
French:LIEUR DE TYPE RINK-CHLORURE POUR SYNTHESE ORGANIQUE EN PHASE SOLIDE DE MOLECULES ORGANIQUES[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase08.09.1999National basic fee paid 
08.09.1999Search fee paid 
08.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
08.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
12.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/13]
27.10.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
05.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
04.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
04.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]US5268423  (JORAN ALVIN D [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-19 *;
 [A]GB2297551  (ZENECA LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * claims 1-13 *;
 [A]JPH05271332  ;
 [A]EP0687691  (UNIV MINNESOTA [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-8 *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 46, Database accession no. 1993-365270, XP002308412 & JPH05271332 A 19931019 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1 * column A *
International search[AP]US5684130  (SUCHOLEIKI IRVING [US]);
 [A]US5601992  (LERNER MICHAEL R [US], et al);
 [A]US5268423  (JORAN ALVIN D [US])