Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973463

EP0973463 - INTRAVENOUS SITE PROTECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 14.07.2004  [2004/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Padilla, James D. Jr.
Urb. Borinquen Calle Antonio Saez, Q-37
Cabo Rojo, Puerto Rico 00623 / PR
[2004/03]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Padilla, James D. Jr.
105A South Front Street
Wilmington, NC 28401 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Former [2000/04]Becker, Eberhard, Dr.
Patentanwälte Becker, Kurig, Straus Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date98913132.123.03.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US05918
Priority number, dateUS1997083830908.04.1997         Original published format: US 838309
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844879
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973463
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973463
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/02, A61F5/37
[2001/10]
Former International [2000/04]A61F5/37
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:SCHUTZVORRICHTUNG FÜR INTRAVENÖSEN ZUGANG[2000/04]
English:INTRAVENOUS SITE PROTECTION DEVICE[2000/04]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION DE SITE INTRAVEINEUX[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase03.11.1999National basic fee paid 
03.11.1999Search fee paid 
03.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
03.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
11.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2002Fee for grant paid
24.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
20.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI11.06.2003
DK11.09.2003
GR11.09.2003
[2004/29]
Former [2004/05]FI11.06.2003
GR11.09.2003
Former [2004/02]GR11.09.2003
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US5238010  (GRABENKORT RICHARD W [US], et al);
 [X]US4561857  (SACKS NORMAN L [US]);
 [Y]US4870976  (DENNY THOMAS A [US]);
 [Y]US2693794  (VERNON NEVILLC JOHN);
 [Y]US4633863  (FILIPS CHESTER P [US], et al)