Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973500

EP0973500 - USE OF SODIUM CHANNEL BLOCKER IN THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT FOR PREVENTING OPTIC NERVE DEGENERATION ASSOCIATED WITH GLAUCOMA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.10.2008
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.10.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.11.2008  [2008/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALLERGAN, INC.
2525 Dupont Drive
Irvine, CA 92612 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/36]For all designated states
ALLERGAN, INC.
2525 Dupont Drive
Irvine CA 92612 / US
Former [2003/31]For all designated states
Allergan, Inc.
2525 Dupont Drive
Irvine, CA 92612 / US
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Allergan Sales, Inc.
2525 Dupont Drive
Irvine, CA 92612 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ADORANTE, Joseph, S.
5146 Thorn Tree
Irvine, CA 92615 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date98913141.226.03.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US05941
Priority number, dateUS1997082719427.03.1997         Original published format: US 827194
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843612
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973500
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/00, A61K45/00
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG EINES NATIUMIONENKANALBLOCKERS ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ARZNEIMITTELS ZUR VORBEUGUNG DER MIT GLAUKOMA EINHERGEHENDEN SEHNERVDEGENERATION[2000/04]
English:USE OF SODIUM CHANNEL BLOCKER IN THE MANUFACTURE OF A MEDICAMENT FOR PREVENTING OPTIC NERVE DEGENERATION ASSOCIATED WITH GLAUCOMA[2000/04]
French:UTILISATION D'UN INHIBITEUR DE CANAUX SODIQUES DANS LA FABRICATION D'UN MEDICAMENT DESTINE A PREVENIR UNE DEGENERESCENCE DU NERF OPTIQUE ASSOCIEE AU GLAUCOME[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase20.09.1999National basic fee paid 
20.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
15.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.10.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/45]
18.06.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
28.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0608604  (ROHTO PHARMA) [X] 1,3-5,7-9 * p.3, l.17 and claims 1-5 *;
 [X]EP0659430  (SANDOZ AG ;SANDOZ LTD (CH); SANDOZ AG (DE)) [X] 1,4,5,7-9 * p.3, l.23-29 and l.37-40; claims 1-10 *;
 [X]FR2714828  (RHONE POULENC RORER SA) [X] 5-7 * p.3, l.24-25; p.4, l.25-26; claims 1-4 *;
 [X]US5610184  (SHAHINIAN JR LEE) [X] 5 * col.4, l.1-13 and l.43-50 *
 [X]  - ZIMMERMAN ET AL, Textbook of ocular pharmacology, USA, LIPPINCOTT-RAVEN PUBL., (199702), XP002074368 [X] 1-10 * p.331, p.332, p.334; see espec. p.331, par. Excitoxicity and diseases.., Table 29-1; p.334, Sodium channel blockers *
 [X]  - DREYER E.B., "Intelligent selection of glutamate antagonists for the management of glaucoma", INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY & VISUAL SCIENCE, (19970315), vol. 38, no. 4(part 1-2, XP002074367 [X] 1-10 * abstract *