Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973413

EP0973413 - NUTRITIONAL FORMULATIONS CONTAINING LACTO-N-NEOTETRAOSE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  07.10.2011
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Abbott Laboratories
Chad 0377/AP6D-2, 100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PRIETO, Pedro, A.
1644 Crusoe Drive
West Worthington, OH 43235 / US
02 / KROENING, Terry, A.
4073 Blendon Grove Way
Gahanna, OH 43230 / US
 [2011/45]
Former [2000/04]01 / PRIETO, Pedro, A.
1644 Crusoe Drive
West Worthington, OH 43235 / US
02 / KROENING, Terry, A.
243 Landover Road
Gahanna, OH 43230 / US
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/45]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
Former [2005/45]Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Former [2000/04]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date98913279.030.03.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US06217
Priority number, dateUS1997082922031.03.1997         Original published format: US 829220
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9843495
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973413
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973413
Date:28.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/31]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0973413
Date:09.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/45]
Search report(s)International search reportEP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/09, A23L1/304, A23L1/302, A23C9/20
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:LACTO-N-NEOTETRAOSE ENTHALTENDE ERNÄHRUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2004/11]
English:NUTRITIONAL FORMULATIONS CONTAINING LACTO-N-NEOTETRAOSE[2000/04]
French:FORMULATIONS NUTRITIONNELLES CONTENANT DE LA LACTO-N-NEOTETRAOSE[2000/04]
Former [2000/04]LACTO-N-NEOTETRAOSEENTHALTENDE ERNÄHRUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN
Entry into regional phase11.10.1999National basic fee paid 
11.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
11.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
12.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.04.2004Fee for grant paid
16.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.04.2005  28.04.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Numico Research B.V.
P.O. Box 7005
6700 CA WAGENINGEN / NL
Opponent's representative
Meekel, Arthur Augustinus P.
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2005/24]
Opponent(s)01  27.04.2005  28.04.2005  ADMISSIBLE
Numico Research B.V.
P.O. Box 7005
6700 CA WAGENINGEN / NL
Opponent's representative
Meekel, Arthur Augustinus P.
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
02.06.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.02.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.11.2006Date of oral proceedings
10.01.2007Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2010Reply to a communication from the opposition division
21.09.2010Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
01.10.2010Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.06.2011Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
16.09.2011Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition09.03.2007Appeal received No.  T0649/07
16.05.2007Statement of grounds filed
23.06.2009Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
23.06.2009Date of oral proceedings
26.06.2009Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
04.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0313533  (BIOCARB AB [SE]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [DX]WO9116449  (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US]) [DX] 1-16 * page 21, line 19 - page 22, line 6 * * page 24, lines 11-22; claims 1,32,33 *;
 US5288637  [ ] (ROTH STEPHEN [US]);
 [A]BE518409  (AMERICAN HOME PRODUCTS) [A] 1-16 * claim - *;
 [DA]WO9610086  (UNIV ROCKEFELLER [US]) [DA] 1 * figure 1; claim - *;
 [A]  A.KOBATA ET AL., "Oligosaccharides of human milk II", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY. (MICROFILMS), MD US, (19691025), vol. 244, no. 20, pages 5496 - 5502, XP002071966 [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  S.THURL ET AL., "Variations of neutral oligosacharides and lactose in human milk during the feeding", ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR ERNÄHRUNGSWISSENSCHAFT, (1993), vol. 32, no. 41, pages 262 - 269, XP002071967 [A] 1 * page 264, paragraph 3 - page 266, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01611164
ExaminationUS4895838
OppositionWO9524495
    - CRAVIOTO ET AL, "J.Infections Diseases", (1991), pages 1247 - 1255,
    - BIOSI, BIOTECH. BIOCHEM., (1994), vol. 58(9), pages 1720 - 1722,