Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972068

EP0972068 - A PROCESS FOR SYNTHESIZING OLIGOSACCHARIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.01.2005
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.03.2005  [2005/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Abbott Laboratories
Chad 0377/AP6D-2, 100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PRIETO, Pedro, A.
1644 Crusoe Drive
West Worthington, OH 43235 / US
02 / KLEMAN-LEYER, Karen, M.
92 Hampton Park East
Westerville, OH 43230 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date98913286.530.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998US06239
Priority number, dateUS1997082901031.03.1997         Original published format: US 829010
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844145
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972068
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C12P19/18
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE VON OLIGOSACCHARIDEN[2000/03]
English:A PROCESS FOR SYNTHESIZING OLIGOSACCHARIDES[2000/03]
French:TECHNIQUE DE SYNTHESE D'OLIGOSACCHARIDES[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase28.09.1999National basic fee paid 
28.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
14.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/10]
07.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
05.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
04.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO9502683  (NEOSE PHARM INC [US]) [X] 1-8,10-22 * page 6, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 16, paragraph 6 - page 18, paragraph 1; example 1 * [Y] 9;
 [Y]US5516665  (WONG CHI-HUEY [US]) [Y] 9 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 7 *;
 [DA]WO9116449  (UNIV PENNSYLVANIA [US]) [DA] 1-22 * page 8, line 13 - line 21 * * page 9, line 24 - page 10, line 17 * * page 12, line 17 - page 15, line 14 * * page 17, line 2 - line 26 *;
 [DA]WO9610086  (UNIV ROCKEFELLER [US]) [DA] 1-22 * page 27, line 7 - page 28, line 22 * * page 30, line 11 - page 31, line 25 * * page 33, line 1 - line 7 *