Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972405

EP0972405 - COMPUTER SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR CAPTURE, EDITING AND PLAYBACK OF MOTION VIDEO COMPRESSED USING INTERFRAME AND INTRAFRAME TECHNIQUES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.07.2003
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.08.2003  [2003/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Avid Technology, Inc.
Avid Technology Park, One Park West
Tewksbury, MA 01876 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/25]For all designated states
AVID TECHNOLOGY, INC.
Avid Technology Park, One Park West
Tewksbury, MA 01876 / US
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
AVID TECHNOLOGY, INC.
Metropolitan Technology Park, One Park West
Tewksbury, MA 01876 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SPORER, Michael
31 Longfellow Road
Wellesley, MA 02181 / US
02 / CORNOG, Katherine, H.
26 Chestnut Street
Newburyport, MA 01950 / US
03 / ZAWOJSKI, Peter
32 Packard Drive
Merrimack, NH 03054 / US
04 / HAMILTON, James
684 Hillcrest Way
Redwood City, CA 94062 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire, 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date98913292.330.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998US06246
Priority number, dateUS1997083298704.04.1997         Original published format: US 832987
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9846023
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972405
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0972405
Date:28.08.2002
Language:EN
[2002/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/926, H04N9/804, G11B27/034, G11B27/30, G11B27/10, H04N7/32, H04N7/50, H04N7/52, H04N7/58
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/03]
TitleGerman:RECHNERSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN ZUR AUFNAHME, NACHBEARBEITUNG UND WIEDERGABE VON MITTELS INTERFRAME- UND INTRAFRAME-TECHNIKEN KOMPRIMIERTEM BEWEGTBILDVIDEO[2000/03]
English:COMPUTER SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR CAPTURE, EDITING AND PLAYBACK OF MOTION VIDEO COMPRESSED USING INTERFRAME AND INTRAFRAME TECHNIQUES[2000/03]
French:SYSTEME INFORMATIQUE ET PROCEDE DE SAISIE, D'EDITION ET DE REPRODUCTION DE CINEVIDEO AU MOYEN DE TECHNIQUES INTER-IMAGES ET INTRA-IMAGES[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase04.11.1999National basic fee paid 
04.11.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
02.02.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.06.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
28.03.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
07.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2002Fee for grant paid
03.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34]
Request for further processing for:07.06.2001Request for further processing filed
07.06.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.06.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP0725399  (SONY CORP) [X] 2,3 * the whole document * [A] 1;
 [XAY]EP0696798  (SONY CORP) [X] 2 * column 5, line 56 - column 23, line 54 * [A] 4,5 [Y] 1,3;
 [PXA]WO9719552  (IMEDIA CORP) [PX] 3 * page 10, line 3 - page 12, line 9 * * page 14, line 27 - page 29, line 7 * [PA] 1,2;
 [AD]US5495291  (ADAMS CHRISTOPHER) [AD] 3 * column W *;
 [DA]US5577190  (PETERS ERIC C) [DA] 1-5 * column W *;
 [DA]WO9321636  (AVID TECHNOLOGY INC) [DA] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US5045940  (PETERS ERIC C ET AL) [AD] 1-5 * column W *;
 [AD]US5267351  (REBER STEPHEN J ET AL) [AD] 1-5 * column W *
 [YA]  - WEISS S M, "SWITCHING FACILITIES IN MPEG-2: NEVASSARY BUT NOT SUFFICIENT", SMPTE JOURNAL, WHITE PLAINS, NY, US, (19951201), vol. 104, no. 12, pages 788 - 802, XP000543847 [Y] 1,3 * the whole document * [A] 2,4,5
 [A]  - HEDTKE R ET AL, "SCHNITTBEARBEITUNG VON MPEG-2-CODIERTEN VIDEOSEQUENZEN", FERNSEH UND KINOTECHNIK, ISSN 0015-0142,HEIDELBERG,DE, (19960701), vol. 50, no. 7, pages 367 - 373, XP000623229 [A] 1-5 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SARAIYA A ET AL, "ENCODING SOLUTIONS FOR MPEG SYSTEMS", WESCON '95 CONFERENCE RECORD. MICROELECTRONICS, COMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY, PRODUCING QUALITY PRODUCTS, MOBILE AND PORTABLE POWER, EMERGING TECHNOLOGIES, SAN FRANCISCO, NOV. 7 - 9, 1995, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19951107), pages 732 - 737, XP000586644 [A] 1-5 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SHIU J ET AL, "A LOW-COST EDITOR FOR MPEG-1 SYSTEM STREAMS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, ISSN 0098-3063,NEW YORK,US, (199508), vol. 41, no. 3, pages 620 - 625, XP000539515 [A] 1-5 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.468027
 [A]  - RANGAN P V ET AL, "CONTINUITY AND SYNCHRONIZATION IN MPEG", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19960101), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 52 - 60, XP000548810 [A] 1-3 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.481693