blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0972224

EP0972224 - IMPROVED PATTERN FOR COLOR MODIFYING CONTACT LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/49]For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Former [2000/03]For all designated states
Wesley-Jessen Corporation
333 East Howard Avenue
Des Plaines, Illinois 60018 5903 / US
Inventor(s)01 / OCAMPO, Gerardo, J.
6918 Olympic Drive
Bridgeview, IL 60455 / US
02 / ATKINS, Barry, L.
6330 N. Merrimac
Chicago, Il 60646 / US
[2000/03]
Representative(s)Dietz, Jörg-Reimar, et al
Novartis AG, Patent- und Markenabteilung, Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2001/44]Dietz, Jörg-Reimar, et al
Novartis AG, Patent- und Markenabteilung, Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Former [2000/03]Merrifield, Sarah Elizabeth, et al
Boult Wade Tennant 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date98913301.230.03.1998
[2000/03]
WO1998US06257
Priority number, dateUS1997082930231.03.1997         Original published format: US 829302
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9844381
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972224
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.10.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:G02C7/04
[2000/03]
CPC:
G02C7/046 (EP,US); G02C7/04 (KR)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTES MUSTER FÜR FARBVERÄNDERNDE KONTAKLINSE[2000/03]
English:IMPROVED PATTERN FOR COLOR MODIFYING CONTACT LENS[2000/03]
French:CONFIGURATION AMELIOREE POUR LENTILLE DE CONTACT MODIFIANT LA COULEUR DES YEUX[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase21.09.1999National basic fee paid 
21.09.1999Search fee paid 
21.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.10.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
21.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
11.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.09.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/17]
26.10.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
31.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3712718  (FUHRMAN A, et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [DA]US4582402  (KNAPP JULIUS Z [US]) [DA] 1,18-22* abstract *
International search[X]EP0472496  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]);
 [X]US5120121  (RAWLINGS DAVID L [US], et al);
 [X]US5160463  (EVANS JOHN M [US], et al);
 [Y]US5414477  (JAHNKE RICHARD L [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.