Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980640

EP0980640 - WIRED OPEN EAR CANAL EARPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.2007
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GN Netcom A/S
Metalbuen 66
2750 Ballerup / DK
[N/P]
Former [2006/10]For all designated states
GN NETCOM A/S
Metalbuen 66
2750 Ballerup / DK
Former [2004/33]For all designated states
GN Netcom A/S
Metalbuen 66
2750 Ballerup / DK
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
RESOUND CORPORATION
220 Saginaw Drive, Seaport Center
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PUTHUFF, Steven, H.
13001 Saratoga-Sunnyvale Road
Saratoga, CA 95070 / US
02 / PLUVINAGE, Vincent
49 Spencer Lane
Atherton, CA 94027 / US
03 / TAENZER, Jon, C.
888 Laverne Way
Los Altos, CA 94022-1107 / US
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Neugebauer, Jürgen , et al
Schroeter Lehmann Fischer & Neugebauer Wolfratshauser Strasse 145
81479 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Neugebauer, Jürgen, Dipl.Phys. , et al
Fleuchaus & Neugebauer GbR Melchiorstrasse 42
D-81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date98913311.101.04.1998
[2000/08]
WO1998US06273
Priority number, dateUS1997083306403.04.1997         Original published format: US 833064
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9844760
Date:08.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/40]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0980640
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980640
Date:08.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.12.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04R25/00
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   LI [2000/08]
TitleGerman:DRAHTGEBUNDENE HÖRMUSCHEL FÜR EINEN OFFENEN GEHÖRGANG[2000/08]
English:WIRED OPEN EAR CANAL EARPIECE[2000/08]
French:ECOUTEUR CABLE A CONDUIT AUDITIF OUVERT[2000/08]
Entry into regional phase29.10.1999National basic fee paid 
29.10.1999Search fee paid 
29.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
29.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/08]
07.05.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.12.2005Fee for grant paid
23.12.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.12.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
05.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
16.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
06.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200205   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
DK08.06.2006
[2007/17]
Former [2006/42]CH08.03.2006
LI08.03.2006
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US4259547  (VALLEY ROBERT A, et al) [X] 1,5-7,9,11,16,20,24,28-30,32,34,39 * column 4, line 15 - column 6, line 38 * [A] 12-15,17-19,21-23,35-38,40 [Y] 2-4,8,10,25-27,31,33;
 [Y]US4396806  (ANDERSON JARED A [US]) [Y] 2-4,10,25-27,33 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 3 * * column 3, line 36 - column 6, line 62 *;
 [Y]DE29608340U  (GN NETCOM AS [DK]) [Y] 8,31 * page 2, lines 11-16 * * page 4, line 14 - page 5, line 24 *
International search[Y]US5031219  (WARD GARY L [US], et al);
 [Y]US5572594  (DEVOE LAMBERT [US], et al);
 [Y]US5278912  (WALDHAUER FRED [US]);
 [Y]US4291203  (BELLAFIORE GASPARE);
 [Y]US5395168  (LEENEN JOSEPH R G M [NL]);
 [A]US5479522  (LINDEMANN ERIC [US], et al);
 [Y]US5452361  (JONES OWEN [GB])