Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970140

EP0970140 - CROSSLINKED POLYASPARTATE SALTS AND A PROCESS FOR THEIR PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solutia Inc.
10300 Olive Boulevard, P.O. Box 66760 St. Louis
Missouri 63166-6760 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Solutia Inc.
10300 Olive Boulevard, P.O. Box 66760
St. Louis, Missouri 63166-6760 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHOU, Yueting
315 Branchport Drive
Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US
02 / KALOTA, Dennis, J.
1306 Green Mist Drive
Fenton, MO 63026 / US
03 / MARTIN, David, Albert
310 Via Del Rey
Angel Fire, NM 87710 / US
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Albrecht, Thomas , et al
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2004/04]Albrecht, Thomas, Dr. , et al
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2000/02]Kraus, Walter, Dr.
Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date98913320.227.03.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998US06296
Priority number, dateUS1997082508527.03.1997         Original published format: US 825085
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842771
Date:01.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970140
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970140
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:C08G69/10, C08G73/06
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:VERNETZTE POLYASPARTATSALZE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[2000/02]
English:CROSSLINKED POLYASPARTATE SALTS AND A PROCESS FOR THEIR PRODUCTION[2000/02]
French:SELS DE POLYASPARTATE RETICULES ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase24.09.1999National basic fee paid 
24.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
24.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
23.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.2003Fee for grant paid
11.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
03.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200205   M06   Fee paid on   22.04.2002
31.03.200306   M06   Fee paid on   03.04.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR04.09.2003
[2004/02]
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9608523  (DONLAR CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,10 * page 10, line 26 - line 29; claim - *;
 [X]US5478919  (KOSKAN LARRY P [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 7, line 11 - line 30 *;
 [DA]  - GIAMMONA G ET AL, "CROSSLINKED ALPHA,BETA-POLYASPARTHYDRAZIDE HYDROGELS: EFFECT OF CROSSLINKING DEGREE AND LOADING METHOD ON CYTARABINE RELEASE RATE", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (19960901), vol. 41, no. 3, pages 195 - 203, XP000599778 [DA] 1-15 * page 196 * * page 199 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-3659(96)01322-3