Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968391

EP0968391 - GAS OVEN CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.04.2005
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MAUGHAN, James, Rollins
3 Ralmar Drive
Scotia, NY 12302 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Goode, Ian Roy , et al
London Patent Operation
General Electric International, Inc.
15 John Adam Street
London
WC2N 6LU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Goode, Ian Roy , et al
London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London
WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2000/01]Goode, Ian Roy , et al
GE LONDON PATENT OPERATION, Essex House, 12/13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date98913340.001.04.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998US06377
Priority number, dateUS1997095401120.10.1997         Original published format: US 954011
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9920943
Date:29.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968391
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:F24C3/12
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/01]
TitleGerman:KONTROLLVORRICHTUNG FÜR GASOFEN[2000/01]
English:GAS OVEN CONTROL[2000/01]
French:COMMANDE D'UN FOUR A GAZ[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase20.07.1999National basic fee paid 
20.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
20.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/20]
20.12.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/20]
Request for further processing for:08.04.2004Request for further processing filed
08.04.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.04.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9719296  (ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS CO [US]) [A] 1-3,19-21,37,43,48,51,53-58 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5655900  (CACCIATORE JOSEPH J [US]) [A] 1-3,19-21,37,43,48,51,53-58 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0727616  (ATAG KEUKENTECHNIEK BV [NL]) [A] 1-3,19-21,37,43,48,51,53-58 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0718562  (DIEHL GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-3,19-21,37,43,48,51,53-58 * abstract *