Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975909

EP0975909 - APPARATUS FOR USE IN APPLYING ELECTROSTATICALLY CHARGED COATING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.12.2002
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.01.2003  [2003/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NORDSON CORPORATION
28601 Clemens Road
Westlake, OH 44145-1119 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
NORDSON CORPORATION
28601 Clemens Road
Westlake, Ohio 44145-1119 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HARTLE, Ronald, J.
543 Hazel Street
Amherst, Ohio 44001 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Findlay, Alice Rosemary , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Findlay, Alice Rosemary , et al
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date98913353.331.03.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998US06425
Priority number, dateUS1997084268415.04.1997         Original published format: US 842684
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9846923
Date:22.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975909
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1998
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:F16L11/127, B05B5/16
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [2000/05]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFTRAGEN VON ELEKTROSTISCH GELADENEM MATERIAL[2000/05]
English:APPARATUS FOR USE IN APPLYING ELECTROSTATICALLY CHARGED COATING MATERIAL[2000/05]
French:DISPOSITIF DESTINE A L'APPLICATION D'UN MATERIAU DE REVETEMENT PORTEUR DE CHARGES ELECTROSTATIQUES[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase21.10.1999National basic fee paid 
21.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
02.02.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/05]
19.08.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US3828112  (JOHANSEN H, et al) [A] 65 * column 2, line 29 - line 62 * * column 3, line 2 *;
 [A]US3896994  (WALBERG ARVID C) [A] 65 * column 7, line 46 - line 60 *;
 [A]GB1562435  (MOORE & CO SAMUEL) [A] 65 * column 3, line 14 - line 51 * * column 4, line 31 - line 104 *;
 [A]WO9505940  (BXL PLASTICS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 65 * page 2, line 16 - line 20 * * page 4, line 17 - line 32 *
International search[XA]US3828112  (JOHANSEN H, et al) [X] 1,2,34,37 * column 2, line 13 - column 3, line 46; figures 1,4 * [A] 3,5-7,10,11,13,14,35,36,38;
 [DA]US3794243  (TAMNY S, et al) [DA] 3,5,7,10,11 * column A; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0409461  (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [A] 3,5,7,10,11 * abstract *
by applicantUS3746254
 US3794243
 US5271569
 US5538186
 US5197676
 US5078168