Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973651

EP0973651 - APPLICATION FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.09.2002
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.10.2002  [2002/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NAKAYAMA, Akihiko
1130-2-102, Hagiwara Gotemba-city
Shizuoka Japan 412-0042 / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Meyers, Hans-Wilhelm, Dr.Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date98913390.502.04.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US06639
Priority number, dateJP1997009069909.04.1997         Original published format: JP 9069997
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9845128
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973651
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973651
Date:07.11.2001
Language:EN
[2001/45]
Search report(s)International search reportEP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:B44C1/17, C09J7/02
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/04]
TitleGerman:ÜBERTRAGUNGSFOLIEN[2000/04]
English:APPLICATION FILMS[2000/04]
French:FILMS D'APPLICATION[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase23.09.1999National basic fee paid 
23.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
05.12.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2001Fee for grant paid
20.06.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.08.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]JPH08207499  ;
 [A]EP0705894  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 30 - page 2, line 40 * * page 5, line 1 - page 5, line 8 *;
 [A]EP0673657  (JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER [US]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 20; examples 1-4 *;
 [A]US5462782  (SU CHING-FANG [TW]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 38 *;
 [A]US4343856  (GOSWAMI JAGADISH C, et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 43 - column 6, line 4; example 1 *;
 [A]WO9508419  (SPECIALTY ADHESIVE FILM CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 5 - page 10, line 6 *;
 [A]WO9222619  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 30 - page 7, line 13; example 1 *;
 [A]DE4141914  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 25 - page 8, line 45 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 096, no. 012, [A] 1 * abstract *