blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0967985

EP0967985 - PROCESS FOR IMPROVING GLUCOSE METABOLISM, SATIETY, AND NUTRIENT ABSORPTION IN COMPANION ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  03.05.2013
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2013Revocation of patentpublished on 05.06.2013  [2013/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE IAMS COMPANY
7250 Poe Avenue
Dayton, Ohio 45414 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
THE IAMS COMPANY
7250 Poe Avenue
Dayton, Ohio 45414 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SUNVOLD, Gregory, D.
651 Snedsted Drive
Eaton, OH 45320-2629 / US
02 / HAYEK, Michael, G.
926 Tammy Circle
Dayton, OH 45415-2136 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Goodier, Claire-Louise, et al
N.V.Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A.
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[N/P]
Former [2009/50]Goodier, Claire-Louise, et al
N.V.Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Former [2008/10]Goodier, Claire-Louise, et al
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Former [2003/49]Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al
Patent Department, Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Rusham Park, Whitehall Lane
Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
Former [2000/01]Caldwell, Judith Margaret, et al
David Keltie Associates, 12 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1AG / GB
Application number, filing date98913414.306.04.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998US06893
Priority number, dateUS19970042957P07.04.1997         Original published format: US 42957 P
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9844932
Date:15.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0967985
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0967985
Date:15.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/715, A61K45/06, A23K1/16, A23K1/18, A61P3/08
[2004/34]
CPC:
A23K50/40 (EP,US); A23K10/30 (EP,US); A23K20/163 (EP,US);
A61P1/18 (EP); A61P3/00 (EP); A61P3/08 (EP);
Y02P60/87 (EP,US); Y10S426/805 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2000/01]A61K31/715, A61K45/06, A23K1/16, A23K1/18
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES GLUKOSEMETABOLISMUS, SÄTTIGUNGSGEFÜHLES, UND NÄHRSTOFFABSORPTION IN HAUSTIEREN[2000/01]
English:PROCESS FOR IMPROVING GLUCOSE METABOLISM, SATIETY, AND NUTRIENT ABSORPTION IN COMPANION ANIMALS[2000/01]
French:PROCEDE POUR AMELIORER LE METABOLISME DU GLUCOSE, LA SATIETE ET L'ABSORPTION DES NUTRIMENTS CHEZ LES ANIMAUX DE COMPAGNIE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase29.10.1999National basic fee paid 
29.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
21.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.01.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
17.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2005Fee for grant paid
29.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.03.2006    ADMISSIBLE
NESTEC S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Opponent's representative
Rupp, Christian, et al, et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 33 06 09
80066 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2006/18]
Opponent(s)01  15.03.2006    ADMISSIBLE
NESTEC S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Opponent's representative
Rupp, Christian, et al, et al
Mitscherlich & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 33 06 09
80066 München / DE
24.04.2006Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
02.11.2006Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.12.2009Date of oral proceedings
30.12.2009Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
30.12.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.12.2012Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ]
19.12.2012Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/23]
19.12.2012Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition23.02.2010Appeal received No.  T0432/10
28.04.2010Statement of grounds filed
19.12.2012Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
19.12.2012Date of oral proceedings
21.01.2013Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:17.03.2003Request for further processing filed
14.03.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.03.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
04.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200205   M06   Fee paid on   21.05.2002
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT15.06.2005
BE15.06.2005
CH15.06.2005
CY15.06.2005
FI15.06.2005
IT15.06.2005
LI15.06.2005
DK15.09.2005
GR15.09.2005
SE15.09.2005
PT23.11.2005
IE06.04.2006
LU06.04.2006
ES30.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
NL01.11.2006
[2009/30]
Former [2009/02]AT15.06.2005
BE15.06.2005
CH15.06.2005
CY15.06.2005
FI15.06.2005
IT15.06.2005
LI15.06.2005
DK15.09.2005
GR15.09.2005
SE15.09.2005
PT23.11.2005
IE06.04.2006
LU06.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
NL01.11.2006
Former [2008/36]AT15.06.2005
BE15.06.2005
CH15.06.2005
FI15.06.2005
IT15.06.2005
LI15.06.2005
DK15.09.2005
GR15.09.2005
SE15.09.2005
PT23.11.2005
IE06.04.2006
LU06.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
NL01.11.2006
Former [2008/15]AT15.06.2005
BE15.06.2005
CH15.06.2005
FI15.06.2005
IT15.06.2005
LI15.06.2005
DK15.09.2005
GR15.09.2005
SE15.09.2005
PT23.11.2005
IE06.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
NL01.11.2006
Former [2007/21]AT15.06.2005
BE15.06.2005
CH15.06.2005
FI15.06.2005
LI15.06.2005
DK15.09.2005
GR15.09.2005
SE15.09.2005
PT23.11.2005
IE06.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
NL01.11.2006
Former [2007/17]AT15.06.2005
BE15.06.2005
CH15.06.2005
FI15.06.2005
LI15.06.2005
DK15.09.2005
GR15.09.2005
SE15.09.2005
PT23.11.2005
IE06.04.2006
MC30.04.2006
Former [2007/07]AT15.06.2005
BE15.06.2005
CH15.06.2005
FI15.06.2005
LI15.06.2005
DK15.09.2005
GR15.09.2005
SE15.09.2005
PT23.11.2005
MC30.04.2006
Former [2006/26]AT15.06.2005
BE15.06.2005
CH15.06.2005
FI15.06.2005
LI15.06.2005
DK15.09.2005
GR15.09.2005
SE15.09.2005
PT23.11.2005
Former [2006/14]AT15.06.2005
BE15.06.2005
CH15.06.2005
FI15.06.2005
LI15.06.2005
GR15.09.2005
SE15.09.2005
PT23.11.2005
Former [2006/13]AT15.06.2005
BE15.06.2005
FI15.06.2005
SE15.09.2005
Former [2005/52]FI15.06.2005
SE15.09.2005
Former [2005/50]SE15.09.2005
Cited inInternational search[DY]US5616569  (REINHART GREGORY A [US]) [DY] 2-6,8-12 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 20 * * examples 4-6 * * claims 1-16 *;
 [XY]  - R.W. NELSON ET AL., "Effects of dietary fiber supplementation on glycemic control in dogs with alloxan-induced diabetes mellitus", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF VETERINARY RESEARCH, US, (1991), vol. 52, no. 2, pages 2060 - 2066, XP002072419 [X] 1,7,13 * see page 2060, Summary; page 2061, column 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 2063, column 2, paragraph L - page 2065, column 1, paragraph L * [Y] 2-6,8-12
 [X]  - R.V. SHARMA ET AL., "Effect of pectin on carbohydrate and fat metabolism", INDIAN JOURNAL OF MEDICAL RESEARCH, INDIA, (1982), vol. 76, pages 771-771 - 775, XP002072420 [X] 1,7,13 * see page 771, Summary; page 772, column 2, paragraph L - page 774, column 1, paragraph 1 *
 [PX]  - M. DIEZ ET AL., "Influence of a blend of fructo-oligosaccharides and sugar beet fiber on nutrient digestibility and plasma metabolite concentrations in healthy Beagles", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF VETERINARY RESEARCH, US, (1997), vol. 58, no. 11, pages 1238 - 1242, XP002072352 [PX] 1-8,13,15 * page 1238, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 1239, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 1239, column 2; table 1 * * page 1240, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 1241, column 2, paragraph L *
 [X]  - S.P. MASSIMINO ET AL., "Fermentable dietary fiber improves glucose tolerance but not immune function in dogs", FASEB JOURNAL., FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY,, BETHESDA, MD US, (1997), vol. 11, no. 3, page A650, XP002072421 [X] 14 * see column 2, Abstract 3750 *
 [X]  - R.A. REIMER ET AL., "Dietary fiber modulates intestinal proglucagon messenger ribonucleic acid and postprandial secretion of glucagon-like peptide-1 and insulin in rats", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1996), vol. 137, no. 9, pages 3948 - 3956, XP002072422 [X] 14 * see page 3948, Abstract; page 3949, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 3950, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3954, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 3955, column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.137.9.3948
 [X]  - H.E. MUIR ET AL., "Nutrient digestion by ileal cannulated dogs as affected by dietary fibers with various fermentation characteristics", JOURNAL OF ANIMAL SCIENCE, US, (1996), vol. 74, no. 7, pages 1641 - 1648, XP002072423 [X] 15 * see page 1641, Abstract; page 1641, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 1642, column 1; table 1 * * page 1644, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 1648, column 1, paragraph 1 *
 [X]  - C. STOCK-DAMGE ET AL., "Effect of dietary fiber supplementation on the secretory function of the exocrine pancreas in the dog", THE AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION, US, (1983), vol. 36, no. 6, pages 843 - 848, XP002072424 [X] 16 * see page 843, Abstract; page 845, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 847, column 1, paragraph L *
 [X]  - WILLARD M D ET AL, "EFFECTS OF DIETARY SUPPLEMENTATION OF FRUCTO-OLIGOSACCHARIDES ON SMALL INTESTINAL BACTERIAL OVERGROWTH IN DOGS", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF VETERINARY RESEARCH, (199405), vol. 55, no. 5, pages 654 - 659, XP000645762 [X] 16 * page 654, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 655, column 2; table 1 * * page 657, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 658, column 2, paragraph 2 *
by applicant   - SUNVOLD ET AL., J. ANIM. SCI., (1995), vol. 73, pages 1099 - 1109
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.