Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969948

EP0969948 - SCREWING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.06.2004
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 07.09.2005  [2005/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SFS intec Holding AG
Nefenstrasse 30
9435 Heerbrugg / CH
[2002/05]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
SFS Industrie Holding AG
Nefenstrasse 30
9435 Heerbrugg / CH
Inventor(s)01 / ÖSTERLE, Helmut
Langäckerweg 7
A-6800 Feldkirch / AT
02 / KÖPPEL, Norbert
Walzenhauserstrasse 52
CH-9434 Au / CH
03 / SCHEIWILLER, Felix
Engelgasse 26
CH-9450 Altstätten / CH
04 / KOUWENHOVEN, Peter
Birkenstrasse 81
CH-9443 Widnau / CH
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Ludescher, Hans , et al
SFS Gruppe
Patentabteilung
Rosenbergsaustrasse 10
9435 Heerbrugg / CH
[N/P]
Former [2002/05]Ludescher, Hans , et al
SFS Gruppe Patentabteilung Rosenbergsaustrasse 10
9435 Heerbrugg / CH
Former [2000/02]Ludescher, Hans
SFS Stadler Gruppe Patentabteilung Nefenstrasse 30
9435 Heerbrugg / CH
Application number, filing date98913550.416.02.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998EP00871
Priority number, dateDE199711278326.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19712783
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9842480
Date:01.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0969948
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969948
Date:06.08.2003
Language:DE
[2003/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:B25B13/44
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
Extension statesAL14.08.1999
LT14.08.1999
LV14.08.1999
MK14.08.1999
RO14.08.1999
SI14.08.1999
TitleGerman:SCHRAUBERELEMENT[2000/02]
English:SCREWING ELEMENT[2000/02]
French:ELEMENT DE VISSAGE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase14.08.1999National basic fee paid 
14.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
05.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
18.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.05.2003Fee for grant paid
07.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
05.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
28.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200104   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI06.08.2003
IE06.08.2003
NL06.08.2003
DK06.11.2003
GR06.11.2003
ES17.11.2003
PT06.01.2004
AT16.02.2004
LU16.02.2004
BE28.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
[2005/36]
Former [2005/23]FI06.08.2003
IE06.08.2003
NL06.08.2003
DK06.11.2003
GR06.11.2003
ES17.11.2003
PT06.01.2004
LU16.02.2004
BE28.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
Former [2005/14]FI06.08.2003
IE06.08.2003
NL06.08.2003
DK06.11.2003
GR06.11.2003
ES17.11.2003
PT06.01.2004
BE28.02.2004
MC28.02.2004
Former [2005/02]FI06.08.2003
IE06.08.2003
NL06.08.2003
DK06.11.2003
GR06.11.2003
ES17.11.2003
PT06.01.2004
MC28.02.2004
Former [2004/46]FI06.08.2003
IE06.08.2003
NL06.08.2003
DK06.11.2003
GR06.11.2003
ES17.11.2003
PT06.01.2004
Former [2004/31]FI06.08.2003
IE06.08.2003
NL06.08.2003
DK06.11.2003
GR06.11.2003
PT06.01.2004
Former [2004/29]FI06.08.2003
IE06.08.2003
NL06.08.2003
DK06.11.2003
GR06.11.2003
Former [2004/14]FI06.08.2003
NL06.08.2003
GR06.11.2003
Former [2004/13]FI06.08.2003
NL06.08.2003
Former [2004/12]FI06.08.2003
Cited inInternational search[XY]FR15845E  (EMILE LACHEZE [FR]) [X] 1-5,17 * page 2, line 17 - line 28 * * page 2, line 62 - line 75; figures 4-6 * [Y] 6,7,14,15;
 [YA]US2434354  (EMMONS EUGENE R) [Y] 6,7,14 * column 2, line 4 - line 29; figure - * [A] 1,4,8-10;
 [YA]US1583554  (HOOVER EDWARD M) [Y] 15 * page 1, line 47 - line 57; figures 1,2 * [A] 1,4,6,7;
 [A]GB904356  (LAURENCE EDWARD RUSSELL, et al) [A] 1,12,13 * page 4, line 14 - line 38 * * page 3, line 98 - line 105; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]FR1145069  (A.-H. PACKET) [A] 1,12,13 * page 1, column R, line 31 - page 2, column L, line 2; figure - *;
 [A]US2579438  (LONGFELLOW EARL E) [A] 1 * column 5, line 56 - line 65; figures 1,4-6 *