blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0969896 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0969896



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 374
19.11.2008 Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore Search / examination 1
27.08.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.08.2007 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
11.06.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
23.05.2007 Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
02.05.2007 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
11.04.2007 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 9
11.04.2007 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 2
28.09.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
29.08.2006 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
29.08.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
29.08.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
02.05.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
02.05.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
02.05.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 28
26.01.2006 Claims Search / examination 7
26.01.2006 Description Search / examination 8
26.01.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.12.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
01.12.2005 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
29.11.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.11.2005 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
25.11.2005 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
09.11.2005 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 2
09.11.2005 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
08.11.2005 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 3
11.10.2005 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 7
11.10.2005 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 20
11.10.2005 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 12
11.10.2005 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 2
02.08.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
02.08.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.05.2005 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 2
13.05.2005 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
30.04.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
30.04.2005 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
17.02.2005 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
10.01.2005 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
27.12.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 9
27.12.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
27.12.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 16
27.12.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 14
27.12.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
27.12.2004 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
17.12.2004 Request for further processing Search / examination 48
19.10.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
16.07.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
06.07.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.07.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.03.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
04.03.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.05.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.03.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
08.03.2002 Miscellaneous requests concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
05.03.2002 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 3
12.07.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
21.06.2000 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
21.06.2000 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
29.05.2000 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
13.05.2000 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
11.12.1999 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 7
01.12.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
28.08.1999 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
30.06.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
04.12.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
03.12.1998 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
27.11.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 10
08.11.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
08.11.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 2
29.10.1998 Priority document Search / examination 52
17.08.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 29