blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0969896

Designated contracting states AT 
 BELapse: 28.02.2007
 CH 
 DE 
 DKLapse: 25.01.2007
 ES 
 FILapse: 25.10.2006
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 26.01.2007
 IELapse: 25.10.2006
 IT 
 LI 
 LULapse: 20.02.2007
 MCLapse: 28.02.2007
 NL 
 PTLapse: 26.03.2007
 SELapse: 25.01.2007
Examination procedure29.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase28.08.1999National basic fee paid 
28.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
17.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
19.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
European patent granted25.10.2006
Opposition procedure26.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit published on 17.10.2007 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:12.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:12.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:SI PAYMENT 19990828
 
Event date:12.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19990828
 
Event date:23.08.2000 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:INTELLIGENT IMPLANTS GMBH
 
Event date:23.08.2000 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:INTELLIGENT IMPLANTS GMBH
 
Event date:02.05.2002 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:TD VERWALTUNGS GMBH
 
Event date:02.05.2002 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:TD VERWALTUNGS GMBH
 
Event date:21.04.2004 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20040304
 
Event date:18.01.2006 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:INTELLIGENT ACQUISITION, LLC
 
Event date:18.01.2006 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:ECKMILLER, ROLF
 
Event date:29.09.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK WD 1026157 HK
Code Expl.:-APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:18.10.2006 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
Inventor Name:ECKMILLER, ROLF
 
Event date:25.10.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20061025
 
Event date:25.10.2006 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20061025
 
Event date:25.10.2006 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:25.10.2006 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:SI
 
Event date:25.10.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:15.11.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:29.11.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
Free Format Text:LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN
 
Event date:07.12.2006 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59813779
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20061207
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:25.01.2007 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20070125
 
Event date:25.01.2007 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20070125
 
Event date:21.02.2007 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
Effective DATE:20070126
 
Event date:28.02.2007 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20070228
 
Event date:26.03.2007 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20070326
 
Event date:04.05.2007 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:23.05.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
 
Event date:27.06.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FD4D
Code Expl.:-EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID
 
Event date:01.07.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2277385 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:11.07.2007 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:IMI INTELLIGENT MEDICAL IMPLANTS AG
 
Event date:03.09.2007 
Event description:NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN
Owner Name:IMI INTELLIGENT MEDICAL IMPLANTS AG
Effective DATE:20070718
 
Event date:28.09.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PUE
Code Expl.: ASSIGNMENT
Owner Name:IMI INTELLIGENT MEDICAL IMPLANTS AG
Free Format Text:INTELLIGENT ACQUISITION, LLC#3415 GATEWAY ROAD#BROOKFIELD, WI 53045-5111 (US) -TRANSFER TO- IMI INTELLIGENT MEDICAL IMPLANTS AG#GOTTHARDSTRASSE 3#6304 ZUG (CH)
 
Event date:28.09.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI NUECKEL
 
Event date:01.10.2007 
Event description:NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS
Owner Name:IMI INTELLIGENT MEDICAL IMPLANTS AG
Effective DATE:20070723
 
Event date:17.10.2007 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20070726
 
Event date:16.11.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
 
Event date:31.12.2007 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
Owner Name:INTELLIGENT ACQUISITION, LLC
Effective DATE:20070228
 
Event date:02.01.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20070228
 
Event date:30.04.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20070126
 
Event date:31.07.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PCAR
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE
Free Format Text:PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI NUECKEL;WEINBERGLISTRASSE 4;6005 LUZERN (CH)
 
Event date:31.08.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20070220
 
Event date:12.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 59813779 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:GRAF VON STOSCH PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE
 
Event date:15.11.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PUE
Code Expl.: ASSIGNMENT
Owner Name:PIXIUM VISION SA, FR
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: IMI INTELLIGENT MEDICAL IMPLANTS AG, CH
 
Event date:17.12.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES PC2A
Code Expl.:+TRANSFER OF PATENT
Owner Name:PIXIUM VISION SA
Effective DATE:20131204
 
Event date:01.01.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 732E
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)
Free Format Text:REGISTERED BETWEEN 20131205 AND 20131211
 
Event date:02.01.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59813779 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:PIXIUM VISION SA, FR
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: IMI INTELLIGENT MEDICAL IMPLANTS AG, ZUG, CH
Effective DATE:20131112
 
Event date:02.01.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 59813779 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:GRAF VON STOSCH PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE
Effective DATE:20131112
 
Event date:28.03.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
Owner Name:PIXIUM VISION SA, FR
Effective DATE:20140227
 
Event date:30.07.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL SD
Code Expl.: ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS
Effective DATE:20140723
 
Event date:17.02.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:31.03.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20150223
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:30.04.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20150223
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:30.04.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20150223
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:30.04.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20150224
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:29.05.2015 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20150218
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:22.02.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:30.09.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:15.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MM01 343410 AT T
Code Expl.:-LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES
Effective DATE:20160220
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160229
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160229
 
Event date:07.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL MM
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
Effective DATE:20160301
 
Event date:30.11.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160220
 
Event date:30.12.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160220
 
Event date:31.01.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160301
 
Event date:20.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20170220
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.04.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20170220
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20160221
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20170221
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:02.06.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR GC
Code Expl.: LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED
Effective DATE:20170427
 
Event date:20.02.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 59813779 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:14.03.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20180219
 
Event date:30.04.2018 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20180219