Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969896

EP0969896 - ADAPTIVE SENSO-MOTOR ENCODER FOR NEUROPROSTHESES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IMI Intelligent Medical Implants AG
Gotthardstrasse 3
6304 Zug / CH
[2007/28]
Former [2006/03]For all designated states
Intelligent Acquisition, LLC
3415 Gateway Road
Brookfield, WI 53045-5111 / US
Former [2002/18]For all designated states
TD Verwaltungs GmbH
Stephanstr. 49
90478 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2000/34]For all designated states
Intelligent Implants GmbH
Poppelsdorfer Allee 114
53115 Bonn / DE
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Eckmiller, Rolf
Universität Bonn, Römerstrasse 164
53117 Bonn / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Eckmiller, Rolf
Universität Bonn, Römerstrasse 164
53117 Bonn / DE
 [2006/42]
Former [2006/03]01 / Eckmiller, Rolf
Universität Bonn, Römerstrasee 164
53117 Bonn / DE
Former [2000/02]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Graf von Stosch, Andreas
Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf v. Stosch, Jehle Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/26]Graf von Stosch, Andreas, Dr. rer. nat.
Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf v. Stosch, Jehle Flüggenstrasse 13
80639 München / DE
Former [2002/18]LENZING GERBER
Patentanwälte Münsterstrasse 248
40470 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2000/34]Lenzing, Andreas, Dr. , et al
Lenzing Gerber Patentanwälte Münsterstrasse 248
40470 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2000/02]Lenzing, Andreas, Dr.
Lenzing Gerber Patentanwälte Münsterstrasse 248
40470 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date98913568.620.02.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998EP00971
Priority number, dateDE199710704621.02.1997         Original published format: DE 19707046
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9836793
Date:27.08.1998
Language:DE
[1998/34]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969896
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0969896
Date:25.10.2006
Language:DE
[2006/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.11.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/02]
Extension statesSI28.08.1999
TitleGerman:LERNFÄHIGER SENSOMOTORISCHER ENCODER FÜR NEUROPROTHESEN[2000/02]
English:ADAPTIVE SENSO-MOTOR ENCODER FOR NEUROPROSTHESES[2000/02]
French:CODEUR SENSORI-MOTEUR ADAPTATIF POUR NEUROPROTHESES[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase28.08.1999National basic fee paid 
28.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
04.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.10.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
17.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.08.2006Fee for grant paid
29.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP06001551.8  / EP1666089
Opposition(s)26.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42]
Request for further processing for:17.12.2004Request for further processing filed
17.12.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.01.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
17.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
19.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI25.10.2006
IE25.10.2006
DK25.01.2007
SE25.01.2007
GR26.01.2007
LU20.02.2007
BE28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT26.03.2007
[2010/05]
Former [2008/21]FI25.10.2006
IE25.10.2006
DK25.01.2007
SE25.01.2007
GR26.01.2007
BE28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT26.03.2007
Former [2008/15]FI25.10.2006
IE25.10.2006
DK25.01.2007
SE25.01.2007
BE28.02.2007
MC28.02.2007
PT26.03.2007
Former [2007/29]FI25.10.2006
SE25.01.2007
PT26.03.2007
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5501703  (HOLSHEIMER JAN [NL], et al) [Y] 13 * column 1, line 15 - column 2, line 43 *;
 [Y]US5522863  (SPANO MARK L [US], et al) [Y] 14 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 34 *;
 [A]US4146029  (ELLINWOOD JR EVERETT H) [A] 1-19 * column 3, line 9 - line 46 *
 [YA]  - ECKMILLER R, "Biology-inspired pulse processing neural networks (BPN) for neurotechnology", ICANN '94., PROCEEDINGS OF INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ARTIFICIAL NEURAL NETWORKS, SORRENTO, ITALY, 26-29 MAY 1994, ISBN 3-540-19887-3, 1994, Berlin, Germany, Springer-Verlag, Germany, pages 1329 - 1334 vol.2, XP002071156 [Y] 1-3,10,13,14 * page 1331, line 1 - page 1332, line 11; figure 2 * [A] 4-9,11,12,15-19
 [Y]  - ECKMILLER R E, "Concerning the development of retina implants with neural nets", PROGRESS IN NEURAL INFORMATION PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS OF 1996 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON NEURAL INFORMATION PROCESSING. ICONIP '96, HONG KONG, 24-27 SEPT. 1996, 1996, Singapore, Springer-Verlag, Singapore, pages 21 - 28 vol.1, XP002071155 [Y] 1-3,10 * page 21, line 1 - page 24, line 26; figures 1-5 *