Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0969790

EP0969790 - COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING ACNE ROSACEA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  08.07.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2005Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 24.08.2005  [2005/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft
Unnastrasse 48
20245 Hamburg / DE
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / DIEMBECK, Walter
Osterfeldstrasse 79 d
D-22529 Hamburg / DE
02 / HOPPE, Udo
Lottbeker Weg 7
D-22397 Hamburg / DE
03 / SALZER, Birgit
Alsterkamp 16
D-20149 Hamburg / DE
04 / SAUERMANN, Gerhard
Hambrook 14
D-24649 Wiemersdorf / DE
05 / STEINKRAUS, Volker
Fontanestrasse 18
D-22609 Hamburg / DE
[2000/02]
Application number, filing date98913571.020.02.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998EP00991
Priority number, dateDE199710658121.02.1997         Original published format: DE 19706581
DE199711156520.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19711565
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9836730
Date:27.08.1998
Language:DE
[1998/34]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0969790
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.1998
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/00
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:ZUBEREITUNGEN FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON ROSACEA[2000/02]
English:COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING ACNE ROSACEA[2000/02]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE TRAITEMENT DE L'ACNE ROSACEE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase28.07.1999National basic fee paid 
28.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.08.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
21.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
03.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
08.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200003   M06   Fee paid on   15.04.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0631776  (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]) [X] 17 * claims 1,3 *;
 [X]WO9626711  (OREAL [FR], et al) [X] 1-17 * the whole document * * page 8, line 41 *;
 [XP]WO9715280  (OREAL [FR], et al) [XP] 1-17 * the whole document * * page 6, line 15 - line 25; claim 13 * * page 10, line 38 * * page 15, line 20 * * page 16, line 2 - line 6 *;
 [XP]FR2744915  (OREAL [FR]) [XP] 1-17 * page 4, line 5 - line 11 * * page 8, line 19 * * page 9, line 10 - line 18 *;
 [X]WO9524884  (HANDELMAN JOSEPH H [US], et al) [X] 3,9,10,16,17 * the whole document *
 [X]  - S.M.BIRNBAUM ET AL., "Preparation of the Optical Isomers of Arginine, Histidine and S-Benzylcysteine by Asymmetric Enzymatic Hydrolysis of their Acetyl Derivatives", ARCH.BIOCHEM., (1952), vol. 39, pages 108 - 118, XP002075668 [X] 17 * page 116 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-9861(52)90265-8
 [X]  - A.A.QURESHI ET AL., "From Bedside to the Bench and Back", ARCH. DERMATOL., (199608), vol. 132, no. 8, pages 889 - 903, XP002075669 [X] 1-17 * page 892, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/archderm.132.8.889
 [XP]  - G.SAUERMANN ET AL., "Influence of NO-Synthase Antagonists in Rosacea Patients", J.INVEST DERMATOL., (199704), vol. 108, no. 4, page 657, XP002075670 [XP] 1-17 * abstract *