Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968211

EP0968211 - TETRAZOLE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/01]NOVEL TETRAZOLES
[2003/10]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.07.2004
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.08.2004  [2004/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALTANA Pharma AG
Byk-Gulden-Strasse 2
78467 Konstanz / DE
[2003/35]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
ALTANA Pharma AG
Byk-Gulden-Str. 2
78467 Konstanz / DE
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Byk Gulden Lomberg Chemische Fabrik GmbH
Byk-Gulden-Str. 2
78467 Konstanz / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHMIDT, Beate
Allensbacher Strasse 5
D-78476 Allensbach / DE
02 / AMSCHLER, Hermann
DECEASED / DE
03 / ULRICH, Wolf-Rüdiger
Alpenstr.2
D-78464 Konstanz / DE
04 / MARTIN, Thomas
St.-Martins-Weg 13
D-78462 Konstanz / DE
05 / BÄR, Thomas
Berggässle 5
D-78479 Reichenau / DE
06 / HUMMEL, Rolf-Peter
Altbohlstrasse 32
D-78315 Radoflzell / DE
07 / HATZELMANN, Armin
Alter Wall 3
D-78467 Konstanz / DE
08 / BOSS, Hildegard
Steig 6b
D-78476 Allensbach / DE
09 / BEUME, Rolf
Bohlstrasse 13
D-78465 Konstanz / DE
10 / KLEY, Hans-Peter
Im Weinberg 3b
D-78476 Allensbach / DE
11 / HÄFNER, Dietrich
Beethovenstrasse 5
D-78464 Konstanz / DE
12 / GOEBEL, Karl-Josef
Im Kirchental 12
D-78315 Radolfzell / DE
13 / FLOCKERZI, Dieter
Ackerweg 26
D-78476 Allensbach / DE
 [2003/23]
Former [2000/01]01 / GUTTERER, Beate
Allensbacher Strasse 6b
D-78476 Allensbach / DE
02 / AMSCHLER, Hermann
Hohenhewenstrasse 19
D-78315 Radolfzell / DE
03 / ULRICH, Wolf-Rüdiger
Hebelstrasse 3
D-78464 Konstanz / DE
04 / MARTIN, Thomas
Sonnenbühlstrasse 73
D-78464 Konstanz / DE
05 / BÄR, Thomas
Blarerstrasse 16
D-78462 Konstanz / DE
06 / HUMMEL, Rolf-Peter
Altbohlstrasse 32
D-78315 Radoflzell / DE
07 / HATZELMANN, Armin
Alter Wall 3
D-78467 Konstanz / DE
08 / BOSS, Hildegard
Flurweg 3a
D-78464 Konstanz / DE
09 / BEUME, Rolf
Bohlstrasse 13
D-78465 Konstanz / DE
10 / KLEY, Hans-Peter
Im Weinberg 3b
D-78476 Allensbach / DE
11 / HÄFNER, Dietrich
Beethovenstrasse 5
D-78464 Konstanz / DE
12 / GOEBEL, Karl-Josef
Im Kirchental 12
D-78315 Radolfzell / DE
13 / FLOCKERZI, Dieter
Ackerweg 26
D-78476 Allensbach / DE
Application number, filing date98913621.303.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998EP01168
Priority number, dateDE199710929307.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19709293
EP1997010392408.03.1997         Original published format: EP 97103924
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9840382
Date:17.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968211
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968211
Date:27.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:C07D471/04, A61K31/435, // (C07D471/04, 221:00, 221:00)
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
Extension statesAL07.10.1999
LT07.10.1999
LV07.10.1999
MK07.10.1999
RO07.10.1999
SI07.10.1999
TitleGerman:TETRAZOLE DERIVATE[2003/10]
English:TETRAZOLE DERIVATIVES[2003/10]
French:COMPOSES TETRAZOLES[2003/10]
Former [2000/01]TETRAZOLE
Former [2000/01]NOVEL TETRAZOLES
Former [2000/01]NOUVEAUX COMPOSES TETRAZOLES
Entry into regional phase07.10.1999National basic fee paid 
07.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
12.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
14.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2003Fee for grant paid
20.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34]
Request for further processing for:14.09.2002Request for further processing filed
16.09.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.10.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
16.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP0247971  (SANDOZ) [DA] 1,10 * claims 1-7 *