Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968136

EP0968136 - USE OF ALKALICARBONATE PEROXYHYDRATES IN FISH FARMING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.07.2004
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.07.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.08.2004  [2004/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Söll GmbH
Schleizer Strasse 105
95028 Hof / DE
[2003/29]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
Willuweit, Thomas
Schleizer Strasse 105
95028 Hof / DE
For all designated states
Söll, Peter
Alte Plauener Strasse 61
95028 Hof / DE
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Solvay Interox GmbH
Hans-Böckler-Allee 20
30173 Hannover / DE
For all designated states
Willuweit, Thomas
Schleizer Strasse 105
95028 Hof / DE
For all designated states
Söll, Peter
Alte Plauener Strasse 61
95028 Hof / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WILLUWEIT, Thomas
Schleizer Strasse 105
D-95028 Hof / DE
02 / SÖLL, Peter
Alte Plauener Strasse 61
D-95028 Hof / DE
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Christophersen, Ruth
Christophersen & Partner
Patentanwälte
Homberger Strasse 5
40474 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Christophersen, Ruth
Kapellstrasse 12
40479 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date98913656.906.03.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998EP01266
Priority number, dateDE199710967911.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19709679
DE199711181021.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19711810
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9840314
Date:17.09.1998
Language:DE
[1998/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968136
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968136
Date:27.08.2003
Language:DE
[2003/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:C02F1/50, C02F1/72, A01K61/00
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON ALKALICARBONAT-PEROXYHYDRATEN IN DER FISCHZUCHT[2000/01]
English:USE OF ALKALICARBONATE PEROXYHYDRATES IN FISH FARMING[2000/01]
French:UTILISATION DE PEROXYHYDRATES DE CARBONATES ALCALINS EN PISCICULTURE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase06.10.1999National basic fee paid 
06.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
06.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
02.06.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
08.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2003Fee for grant paid
24.06.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200104   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2001
Cited inInternational search[XA]US4926795  (HAMILTON FRANK S [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 32 - line 35 * * column 2, line 44 - line 51 * * example - * [A] 5,7;
 [XA]JPS55142587  ;
 [XA]WO9603046  (SOLVAY INTEROX LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * page 4, line 16 - line 19 * * page 8, line 8 - page 9, line 5 * [A] 3,5,8;
 [A]JPS60261600  ;
 [A]WO9518070  (SOELL PETER [DE], et al) [A] 4,6 * the whole document *;
 [DA]EP0737169  (SOELL PETER [DE], et al)
 [XA]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 80, no. 51, Database accession no. 80-91337C, XP002070774 & JPS55142587 A 00000000 (RYONICHI KK) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 7,8
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 06, Database accession no. 86-040177, XP002070775 [X] 1,2 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860520), vol. 010, no. 136, Database accession no. (C - 347), & JP60261600 A 19851224 (SUMITOMO CEMENT KK; OTHERS: 01) [A] 4-6 * abstract *