Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973860

EP0973860 - DETERGENT-PACKAGE COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.08.2005
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For:GB 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House
Blackfriars
London
Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:DE  ES  FR  IT 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For:GB 
UNILEVER PLC
Unilever House Blackfriars
London EC4P 4BQ / GB
For:DE  ES  FR  IT 
UNILEVER N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BOSKAMP, Jelles, Vincent-Unilever Research Lab
Lever Development Centre-Olivier van Noortlaan 120
NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
02 / COLE, Andrew-Lever Brothers Ltd., Port Sunlight
Wirral-P.O. Box 69
Merseyside L62 4ZD / GB
03 / KERR, Colin, Watt-Lever Brothers Ltd.
Port Sunlight,Wirral,P.O. Box 69
Merseyside L62 4ZD / GB
04 / LEMPERS, Edwin, Leo, Mario-Unilever Research Lab
Lever Development Centre,Olivier van Noortlaan 120
NL-3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Elliott, Peter William , et al
Unilever Patent Group
Colworth House
Sharnbrook
Bedford
MK44 1LQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Elliott, Peter William , et al
Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Application number, filing date98913659.324.02.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998EP01274
Priority number, dateGB1997000477607.03.1997         Original published format: GB 9704776
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9840464
Date:17.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973860
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.09.1998
ClassificationInternational:C11D17/00, C11D17/04
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/04]
TitleGerman:WASCHMITTEL/VERPACKUNGS-KOMBINATION[2000/04]
English:DETERGENT-PACKAGE COMBINATION[2000/04]
French:COMBINAISON EMBALLAGE-DETERGENT[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase20.08.1999National basic fee paid 
20.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.09.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
23.10.2000Observations by third parties
02.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2001Observations by third parties
20.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
18.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/39]
09.02.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.110(2) in appeal  [2005/39]
Appeal following examination30.04.2003Appeal received No.  T0921/03
30.07.2003Statement of grounds filed
07.04.2004Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M08) [2004/15]
04.08.2005Interlocutory revision of appeal
04.08.2005Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200508   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0634485  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,10 * page 18, line 1 - line 11 * * page 19, line 28 - line 31 *;
 [D]WO9502681  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al);
 EP0634484  [ ] (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]);
 [DA]WO9518215  (ECOLAB INC [US]) [DA] 1 * page 19, line 4 - page 20, line 28 * * page 4, line 33 - page 6, line 32 * * page 15, line 11 - page 19, line 2 * * example - *;
 [A]WO9220775  (ECOLAB INC [US]) [A] 1,2,10 * see working examples 3,5,6;; claim - *;
 [A]EP0467481  (SARA LEE DE NV [NL]) [A] 1,10-12 * example -; claims 1,7 *;
 [A]WO9206163  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,10 * page 33, line 16 - page 34, line 25 * * example -; claim 1 *
otherUS4133431
    - "VERBUNDMATERIALIEN", ARBEITSMAPPE FUER DEN VERPACKUNGSPRAKTIKER, XX, XX, XX, (19900101), page B361, XP002933811
    - "PVC FILMS", PLASTICS NOW, XX, XX, XX, (20000101), page 01/02, XP002933812